Timonin et al v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Paul Alexander Timonin and Alexander Philip Timonin
Defendant: Constable Wright, Constable Huynh, Constable Armstrong-Woodland, Sr. Constable Lymberopoulos and Sr. Sergeant Timothy King
Case Number: 1:2023cv00197
Filed: April 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2023 Filing 16 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/26/2023 IS CONTINUED TO 07/05/2023 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 06/28/2023.Parties are to participate via telephone through our ZOOM Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 OBSERVERS: Call-in:1-650-479-3207, Code: 160 930 3683 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). A courtesy email of this Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) was also sent to Pro Se Plaintiffs Plaintiff Paul Alexander Timonin at the email address of karfikser@yahoo.com and to Alexander Philip Timonin at the email address of alexandertimonin@gmail.com on 06/23/2023.
June 11, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Alexander Timonin, Alexander Philip Timonin. Constable Wright served on 6/7/2023. (eta)
June 11, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Alexander Timonin, Alexander Philip Timonin. Constable Lymberopoulos served on 6/7/2023. (eta)
June 11, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Alexander Timonin, Alexander Philip Timonin. Timothy King served on 6/7/2023. (eta)
June 11, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Alexander Timonin, Alexander Philip Timonin. Constable Huynh served on 6/7/2023. (eta)
May 24, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Constable Wright. (eta)
May 24, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Constable Lymberopoulos. (eta)
May 24, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Timothy King. (eta)
May 24, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Constable Huynh. (eta)
May 24, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Constable Armstrong-Woodland. (eta)
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
May 15, 2023 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #6 Civil Waiver of Service Packet and a blank summons form has been served by First Class Mail to Plaintiffs Paul Alexander Timonin and Alexander Philip Timonin at the the addresses of record on May 15, 2023. A Pro Se Litigant Handbook was included in the mailing to both Plaintiffs. (eta)
May 12, 2023 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number / Pay.gov Tracking ID: 275GGUTJ re #1 Complaint (eta)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/26/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/27/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Paul Alexander Timonin and Alexander Philip Timonin were served at the following email address: cooper-engineering@bigpond.com on April 28, 2023.
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/27/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - A copy of this order, a blank Application to Proceed In Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, and a file-stamped copy of the Complaint was returned by email to Paul Alexander Timonin and Alexander Philip Timonin at the following email address: cooper-engineering@bigpond.com on April 28, 2023.
April 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Alexander Philip Timonin, Paul Alexander Timonin. (eta)
April 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against All Defendants - filed by Paul Alexander Timonin, Alexander Philip Timonin.(eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timonin et al v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Alexander Timonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Philip Timonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constable Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constable Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constable Armstrong-Woodland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sr. Constable Lymberopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sr. Sergeant Timothy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?