Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines v. Davis
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines
Defendant: Mandy Nicole Davis and Does 1-10, Inclusive
Case Number: 1:2023cv00219
Filed: May 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AND PARTIES AND RELEASE OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION AND ORDER by Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/17/2023. (eta)
July 14, 2023 ADVISORY ENTRY. Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #19 Notice of Dismissal filed by Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines, requires the court's approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address (porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov). The filing party may refer to Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of chambers' email addresses. (eta)
July 13, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Claims and Parties and Release of Notice of Pendency of Action Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines. (Guttman, Steven)
July 11, 2023 Filing 18 EO: In order to allow time for service, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 8/21/2023 to 10/31/2023 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. The public may listen to the proceedings by dialing the Public Dial-in number at 1-650-479-3207 and entering Access code: 1601263445. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. Additionally, Plaintiff's deadline to serve the Complaint on Defendant is 8/21/2023. If Plaintiff has not served Defendant with the Complaint by 8/21/2023, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file a Status Report no later than 8/25/2023, detailing the efforts taken to serve Defendant and the status of service. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
June 13, 2023 Filing 17 Consent Election Form
June 13, 2023 Filing 16 Consent Election Form
June 7, 2023 Filing 15 Consent Election Form
June 6, 2023 Filing 14 EO: In order to allow time for service, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 7/17/2023 to 8/21/2023 at 9:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. The public may listen to the proceedings by dialing the Public Dial-in number at 1-650-479-3207 and entering Access code: 1601263445. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
May 24, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Pendency of Action by Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Property Description)(Guttman, Steven) Modified on 5/25/2023 (eta).
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JAMES A. DUMAS, JR. re #5 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/23/2023. (eta)
May 23, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines. (Guttman, Steven)
May 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. FILING INSTRUCTIONS ARE ATTACHED. While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (Attachments: #1 Election Form ) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
May 22, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
May 22, 2023 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 7/17/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/22/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
May 22, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mandy Nicole Davis. (eta)
May 22, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice as to James A. Dumas, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2844742.Steven Guttman appearing for Plaintiff Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(Guttman, Steven) Modified on 5/23/2023 (eta).
May 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00219 WRP on all further pleadings. (eta)
May 22, 2023 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Guttman, Steven)
May 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines. (Guttman, Steven)
May 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Avoid Fraudulent Transfer (Hawaii Revised Statutes Section 651C et seq.) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2844685.), filed by Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association, a California non-profit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Quitclaim Deed)(Guttman, Steven) Modified on 5/22/2023 (eta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Employes Hospital Association - Coast Lines
Represented By: Steven Guttman
Represented By: James A. Dumas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Nicole Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?