Kaloko Heights Communities, LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company v. TBG Visions, Inc., a New York Incorporated Company et al
Plaintiff: Kaloko Heights Communities, LLC
Defendant: TBG Visions, Inc., Rex Oliver, Michael Erhard and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv00290
Filed: July 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2023 Filing 20 EO: In order to allow time for Defendant to answer the complaint, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 9/11/2023 to 10/23/2023 at 8:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
August 10, 2023 Filing 19 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Michael Erhard. (jni)
August 10, 2023 Filing 18 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Rex Oliver. (jni)
August 10, 2023 Filing 17 AMENDED Summons Issued as to TBG Visions, Inc. (jni)
August 9, 2023 Filing 16 Summons (Proposed) (Choi, Chuck)
August 9, 2023 Filing 15 Summons (Proposed) (Choi, Chuck)
August 9, 2023 Filing 14 Summons (Proposed) (Choi, Chuck)
July 28, 2023 Filing 13 Consent Election Form
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE as to Mark C. Fields, Esq. re #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/24/2023.Attorney Mark C. Fields added Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Kaloko Heights Communities, LLC. (jni)
July 21, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Mark C. Fields Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2869114.Chuck C. Choi appearing for Plaintiff Kaloko Heights Communities, LLC (Choi, Chuck)
July 14, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaloko Heights Communities, LLC. (Ito, Allison)
July 13, 2023 Filing 9 (Redacted) Additional Exhibits to #1 Complaint, filed by Kaloko Heights Communities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7)(Choi, Chuck) Modified on 7/14/2023 (jni)
July 13, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to TBG Visions, Inc., Rex Oliver, Michael Erhard. (jni)
July 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
July 13, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)
July 13, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/11/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/13/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
July 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00290 WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
July 13, 2023 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Choi, Chuck)
July 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Exhibits 1-7; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2865594.), filed by Kaloko Heights Communities, LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Choi, Chuck) Modified on 7/13/2023 to provisionally restrict exhibits as they contain personal identifiers. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaloko Heights Communities, LLC, a Hawaii Limited Liability Company v. TBG Visions, Inc., a New York Incorporated Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaloko Heights Communities, LLC
Represented By: Chuck C. Choi
Represented By: Mark C. Fields
Represented By: Allison A. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBG Visions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Erhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?