David Sansone Company, Inc., et al v. Bolton, et al
Plaintiff: David Sansone Company, Inc., David Sansone, Sansone Company Inc., Los Padres Construction, Inc., Avila Properties, LLC and Sansone Real Estate Investments, LLC
Defendant: Daniel B. Bolton and Janet T. Bolton
Case Number: 1:2023cv00305
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Daniel B. Bolton, Janet T. Bolton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fujioka-Lilley, Terri)
September 7, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avila Properties, LLC, David Sansone Company, Inc., Los Padres Construction, Inc., David Sansone, Sansone Company Inc., Sansone Real Estate Investments, LLC re 12 Terminate Hearings,, Set Hearings, (Akagi, Trisha)
August 21, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Sansone, Sansone Company Inc., Sansone Real Estate Investments, LLC, Avila Properties, LLC, David Sansone Company, Inc., Los Padres Construction, Inc.. Janet T. Bolton served on 7/29/2023. (Akagi, Trisha)
August 21, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Sansone, Sansone Company Inc., Sansone Real Estate Investments, LLC, Avila Properties, LLC, David Sansone Company, Inc., Los Padres Construction, Inc.. Daniel B. Bolton served on 7/29/2023. (Akagi, Trisha)
August 16, 2023 Filing 12 EO: In order to allow time for service, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 9/19/2023 to 12/4/2023 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/26/2023. Please reflect new case number CV 23-00305 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
July 26, 2023 Filing 10 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
July 25, 2023 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/19/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/25/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
July 25, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eta)
July 25, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00305 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta)
July 25, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avila Properties, LLC, David Sansone Company, Inc., Los Padres Construction, Inc., David Sansone, Sansone Company Inc., Sansone Real Estate Investments, LLC. (Akagi, Trisha)
July 25, 2023 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Akagi, Trisha)
July 25, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by David Sansone Company, Inc., a California corporation. (Akagi, Trisha)
July 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2870596.), filed by David Sansone Company, Inc., a California corporation.(Akagi, Trisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Sansone Company, Inc., et al v. Bolton, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sansone Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly G. LaPorte
Represented By: Trisha H.S.T. Akagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sansone
Represented By: Kelly G. LaPorte
Represented By: Trisha H.S.T. Akagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sansone Company Inc.
Represented By: Kelly G. LaPorte
Represented By: Trisha H.S.T. Akagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Padres Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly G. LaPorte
Represented By: Trisha H.S.T. Akagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avila Properties, LLC
Represented By: Kelly G. LaPorte
Represented By: Trisha H.S.T. Akagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sansone Real Estate Investments, LLC
Represented By: Kelly G. LaPorte
Represented By: Trisha H.S.T. Akagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel B. Bolton
Represented By: Terri L. Fujioka-Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet T. Bolton
Represented By: Terri L. Fujioka-Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?