Thorson v. Hawaii Public Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Laurie Thorson
Defendant: Hawaii Public Housing Authority, HPHA, Hakim Ouansafi, Ryan Akamine and Lyle Matsuura
Case Number: 1:2023cv00412
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 EO: In order to allow time for service of the Complaint, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 12/4/2023 to 3/4/2024 at 8:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(wrp1)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
November 13, 2023 Filing 10 Clerk's Office Letter to Plaintiff Laurie Thorson regarding ECF No. #7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, dated November 13, 2023. (eta)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO Waiver of the Service of Summons)(eta)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eta)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #3 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/13/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Laurie Thorson has been served electronically to the email address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 13, 2023. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) This order and the applicable forms and documents for service shall be served by First Class Mail to Laurie Thorson at the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 13, 2023. A copy of this order shall be served by email to the U.S. Marshals Service on November 13, 2023.
November 13, 2023 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS and the forms identified in the Clerk's Letter shall be served by First Class Mail to Laurie Thorson at the address of record on November 13, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eta)
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 EO: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff Laurie Thorson's APPLICATION for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing, ECF No. #4 . Plaintiff must comply with all rules regarding electronic filling and familiarize herself with electronic filing resources, user guide, and training modules available on the Court's website. Plaintiff shall contact the Clerk's Office to obtain the necessary information to allow her to file electronically. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (wrp1) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/4/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/4/2023.ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (mdc)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Permission to E-file by Laurie Thorson. (mdc)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Laurie Thorson. (mdc)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Laurie Thorson. (mdc)
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hawaii Public Housing Authority, Hakim Ouansafi, Ryan Akamine, Lyle Matsuura filed by Laurie Thorson. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorson v. Hawaii Public Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hakim Ouansafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Akamine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Matsuura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?