Firsov v. City and County of Honolulu
Plaintiff: Evgeny Firsov
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu, Rick Blangiardi, Department of Customer Services, City and County of Honolulu and Kimberly Hashiro
Case Number: 1:2023cv00429
Filed: October 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ADD A CO-DEFENDANT(S) re #27 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/14/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Evgeny Firsov shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 15, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
December 8, 2023 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Add a Co-Defendant(s) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Add A Co-Defendant(s) filed by Rick Blangiardi, City and County of Honolulu, Department of Customer Services, City and County of Honolulu, Kimberly Hashiro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gluck, Daniel)
November 30, 2023 Filing 28 EO: Pursuant to Rule 7.1(c) of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii, the Court will decide Plaintiff's #27 Motion to Add a Co-Defendant(s) without a hearing. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(kjm3)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). A courtesy email of this Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) was also emailed to Pro Se Plaintiff Evgeny Firsov at the email address of efirsov@protonmail.com on 11/30/2023.
November 25, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Add a Co-Defendant(s) by Plaintiff Evgeny Firsov. (apg)
November 22, 2023 Filing 26 Brief RESPONSE on Defendant's Reply Memorandum; (Certificate of Service attached) re #4 , #21 - filed by Evgeny Firsov. (eta)
November 21, 2023 Filing 25 EO: By 24 joint agreement of the parties, in light of the pending #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/15/2023 IS CONTINUED TO 02/09/2024 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 02/02/2024.Parties are to participate via telephone through our Zoom Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). A courtesy email of this Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) was also emailed to Pro Se Plaintiff Evgeny Firsov at the email address of efirsov@protonmail.com on 11/21/2023.
November 17, 2023 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #18 - by Evgeny Firsov (eta)
November 17, 2023 Filing 22 BRIEF RESPONSE Regarding the Application of 28 U.S.C. Code 1441 (c)(2); (Certificate of Service attached) re #7 - filed by Evgeny Firsov. (eta)
November 17, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (relating to Dkts. #1 -2, #4 , #11 , #12 ) filed by Rick Blangiardi, City and County of Honolulu, Department of Customer Services, City and County of Honolulu, Kimberly Hashiro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gluck, Daniel) Modified on 11/20/2023 (eta).
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED UNDER A PSEUDONYM re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/16/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Evgeny Firsov shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 17, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
November 15, 2023 Filing 19 EO: COURT ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFF'S "MOTION ON THE APPLICATION OF THE PROVISIONS OF FED. R. CIV. P. 11(C)" UNDER ADVISEMENT On November 13, 2023, pro se Plaintiff Evgeny Firsov ("Plaintiff") filed his "Motion on the application of the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(c)" ("Motion"). [Dkt. no. 18.] The Motion is suitable for disposition without a hearing, pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), and the Court finds that further briefing is not necessary. The Motion is taken under advisement and will be decided alongside the defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint, [filed 10/30/23 (dkt. no. 4.)]. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
November 13, 2023 Filing 18 Motion on the Application of the Provisions of Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(c) re #4 - filed by Evgeny Firsov. (Attachments: #1 Annex 1, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 copy of envelope)(eta) Modified on 11/15/2023 (afe).
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO PROVIDE AN INTERPRETER re #6 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/8/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Evgeny Firsov shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 9, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
November 7, 2023 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION on the Application of the Provisions of Article 28 U.S.C. Code 1441 (c)(2) filed by Rick Blangiardi, City and County of Honolulu, Department of Customer Services, City and County of Honolulu, Kimberly Hashiro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gluck, Daniel)
November 7, 2023 Filing 15 STATEMENT of No Position re #8 MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by Rick Blangiardi, City and County of Honolulu, Department of Customer Services, City and County of Honolulu, Kimberly Hashiro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gluck, Daniel)
November 6, 2023 Filing 14 EO: COURT ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION ON THE APPLICATION OF THE PROVISIONS OF ARTICLE 28 U.S. CODE 1441 (c)(2) (DKT. NO. 7.) On October 23, 2023, Defendants City and County of Honolulu; Rick Blangiardi, Mayor of City and County of Honolulu; Department of Customer Services, City and County of Honolulu ("DCS"); and Kimberly Hashiro, Director of DCS ("Defendants") filed their Notice of Removal, removing this case from the State of Hawai'i First Circuit Court ("state court"), based on federal question jurisdiction. [Dkt. no. 1 at 2-3.] On November 2, 2023, pro se Plaintiff Evgeny Firsov ("Plaintiff") filed his "Motion on the Application of the Provisions of Article 28 U.S. Code 1441(c)(2)" ("Motion"). [Dkt. no. 7.] Because Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, his filings must be liberally construed. See Erickson v. Pardus, 551 U.S. 89, 94 (2007) (per curiam). The Court liberally construes the Motion as a motion for partial remand. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a response by November 16, 2023. Plaintiff may file an optional reply by November 30, 2023. This Court will take the Motion under advisement thereafter. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
November 3, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 , #12 - by Evgeny Firsov (eta)
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 Motion to Deny the #4 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Evgeny Firsov. (eta)
November 3, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Deny the Defendants' #4 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Evgeny Firsov. (eta)
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 EO: In light of the pending #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/27/2023 IS CONTINUED TO 12/15/2023 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 12/08/2023.Parties are to participate via telephone through our ZOOM Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
November 2, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 , #7 , #8 - by Evgeny Firsov (eta)
November 2, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Under a Pseudonym - by Plaintiff Evgeny Firsov (eta)
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION on the Application of the Provisions of Article 28 U.S.C. Code 1441 (c)(2) - by Plaintiff Evgeny Firsov (eta)
November 2, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Provide Interpreter - by Plaintiff Evgeny Firsov (eta)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EO: ORDER SETTING NON-HEARING BRIEFING SCHEDULE.Defendants MOTION #4 to Dismiss, will be considered by Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi as a Non Hearing Motion.Response Memorandum is due: 11/16/2023.Optional Reply Memorandum is due: 11/30/2023.Defendants MOTION #4 to Dismiss; will be taken under submission thereafter. Court to issue Order. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (relating to Dkt. #1 -2) Daniel M. Gluck appearing for Defendants Kimberly Hashiro, Rick Blangiardi, Department of Customer Services, City and County of Honolulu, City and County of Honolulu (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Certificate of Service)(Gluck, Daniel) Modified on 11/1/2023 (eta).
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/27/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/23/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - A copy of the Order shall be served by First Class Mail to Evgeny Firsov at the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on October 24, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
October 23, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00429 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Evgeny Firsov shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on October 24, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
October 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City and County of Honolulu from First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-23-0001232. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2910696), filed by City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 3), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3), #4 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 3), #5 Certificate of Service)(Gluck, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firsov v. City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evgeny Firsov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Daniel M. Gluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Blangiardi
Represented By: Daniel M. Gluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Customer Services, City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Daniel M. Gluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Hashiro
Represented By: Daniel M. Gluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?