Meyer et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Randall Kelly Meyer and Sams Antics Incorporated
Defendant: President Joseph R. Biden, Jr., State of Nebraska, Mike Hilgers, State of Missouri, Andrew Bailey, State of Arkansas, John Timothy Griffin, State of Iowa, Brenna Bird, State of Kansas, Kris William Kobach, State of South Carolina and Alan McCrory Wilson
Case Number: 1:2023cv00470
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL (CA No. 24-164) - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/19/2024. Based on the foregoing, the court CERTIFIES that Plaintiff's appeal is frivolous and DENIES Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal.The Clerk shall transmit a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit (No. 24-164).COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Randall Kelly Meyer shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/19/2024. Additionally, a copy of this Order has been sent to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) via: cmecf_ca9central@ca9.uscourts.gov. (jni)
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 USCA REFERRAL NOTICE as to #9 Notice of Appeal, filed by Randall Kelly Meyer; USCA No. 24-164:This matter is referred to the district court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3); see also Hooker v. American Airlines, 302 F.3d 1091, 1092 (9th Cir. 2002) (revocation of forma pauperis status is appropriate where district court finds the appeal to be frivolous).If the district court elects to revoke in forma pauperis status, the district court is requested to notify this court and the parties of such determination within 21 days of the date of this referral. If the district court does not revoke in forma pauperis status, such status will continue automatically for this appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). This referral shall not affect the briefing schedule previously established by this court.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Randall Kelly Meyer shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/17/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)(jni)
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 Attorney Appeal Packet re #9 Notice of Appeal, filed by Randall Kelly Meyer; USCA No. 24-164. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 District Court Instructions for Civil Appeals, #3 Docket Sheet)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/10/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)(jni)
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER as to #9 Notice of Appeal, filed by Randall Kelly Meyer; USCA No. 24-164. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/10/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)(jni)
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 24-164 for #9 Notice of Appeal, filed by Randall Kelly Meyer. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/10/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)(jni)
January 5, 2024 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #9 Notice of Appeal, and #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, were served via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals on 1/2/2024. (jni)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 EO: On January 2, 2024, pro se Plaintiff Randall Kelly Meyer filed a Notice of Appeal and a Form 4, Motion and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. ECF Nos. #9 & #10 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward these filings to the Ninth Circuit, and this court will take no further action on the request to proceed in forma pauperis unless requested to do so by the Ninth Circuit. (JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
January 2, 2024 Filing 10 (Form 4) MOTION and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - by Plaintiff Randall Kelly Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL from a Judgment or Order of re #7 - by Randall Kelly Meyer; USCA No. 24-164. Filing fee $ 605. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Randall Kelly Meyer shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/3/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).(jni) Modified on 1/9/2024 (jni)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 12/12/2023 pursuant to ECF No. #7 . (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Randall Kelly Meyer has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 12, 2023.
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (1) GRANTING IFP APPLICATION, NO. #3 ; AND (2) DISMISSING COMPLAINT, ECF NO. #1 , WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/12/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Randall Kelly Meyer has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 12, 2023.
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 1/16/2024 to 4/29/2024 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Randall Kelly Meyer will be served by First Class Mail on December 8, 2023 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/16/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/21/2023. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Randall Kelly Meyer was served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). (jni)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Randall Kelly Meyer. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order, #2 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Randall Kelly Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 CLAIMS against Joseph R. Biden, Jr, State of Nebraska, Mike Hilgers, State of Missouri, Andrew Bailey, State of Arkansas, John Timothy Griffin, State of Iowa, Brenna Bird, State of Kansas, Kris William Kobach, State of South Carolina, Alan McCrory Wilson - filed by Randall Kelly Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
November 21, 2023 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 5 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement, has been served ro Randall Kelly Meyer by First Class Mail to the address of record on 11/21/2023. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Kelly Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sams Antics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Timothy Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenna Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris William Kobach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan McCrory Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?