Tagama v. Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mario Tagama
Defendant: Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation doing business as Marriott Koolina Beach Club, Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Darlene Fernandez, Fina Ongoy, Nathan Orden, Steven Sotelo, Francine Kealoha, John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Government Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv00475
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 1/16/2024. (adi)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
January 16, 2024 Filing 16 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held.Plaintiff Mario Tagama appeared, Pro Se.Ashley Chinen appeared on behalf of Defendants.The Court held a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Dates Given. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 4/15/2025 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before DISTRICT JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/1/2025 at 10:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before DISTRICT JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/3/2025 at 10:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 12/18/2024 at 2:00 PM by Video Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/18/2024. Discovery due by 11/18/2024.Other Matters:An Early Settlement Conference is set for May 9, 2024 at 10:00 AM by VTC before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. The Court will provide details regarding VTC access prior to the conference date. Confidential Settlement Statements shall be emailed to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov by May 2, 2024.The parties are directed to consult Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter's Standing Order Regarding Settlement Conferences, available on the Court's public website, regarding the format of the confidential settlement conference statement and settlement conference procedures.Telephonic hearings before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter, will be held via Zoom Dial:1-833-568-8864/ Meeting ID:161 0084 2470. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.(adi)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendants' Scheduling Conference Statement. (Wang, Sarah)
January 5, 2024 Filing 14 Plaintiff Mario Tagama's Scheduling Conference Statement - by Mario Tagama. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jni)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. (Wang, Sarah)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 EO: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff Mario Tagama's APPLICATION for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing, ECF No. #11 . Plaintiff must comply with all rules regarding electronic filling and familiarize himself with electronic filing resources, user guide, and training modules available on the Court's website. Plaintiff shall contact the Clerk's Office to obtain the necessary information to allow him to file electronically. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(wrp1)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing (E-file) - by Mario Tagama (eta)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 EO: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Motion) and DENIES the Motion WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Motion does not establish "exceptional circumstances" warranting the appointment of counsel. See Palmer v. Valdez, 560 F.3d 965, 970 (9th Cir. 2009) (internal citations omitted) ("[A] court may under 'exceptional circumstances' appoint counsel for indigent civil litigants pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1).... When determining whether 'exceptional circumstances' exist, a court must consider 'the likelihood of success on the merits as well as the ability of the petitioner to articulate his claims pro se in light of the complexity of the legal issues involved.'"). (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Mario Tagama will be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 1, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the NEF.
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation. (Wang, Sarah)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. for Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation.. (Wang, Sarah)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 Plaintiff Mario Tagama's MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant to Rule 3(A) of the Rules of Civil Pro Bono Panel for the United States District Court of the District of Hawaii - by Plaintiff Mario Tagama. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mario Tagama, #2 Certificate of Service)(jni)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 12/27/2023 to 1/16/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Mario Tagama will be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 27, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the NEF.
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/27/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/22/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Mario Tagama shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 24, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00475 SOM-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Mario Tagama shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 24, 2023. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Darlene Fernandez, Francine Kealoha, Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation, Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Fina Ongoy, Nathan Orden, Steven Sotelo. (Wang, Sarah)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Steven Sotelo, Darlene Fernandez, Francine Kealoha, Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation, Fina Ongoy, Nathan Orden from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 1CCV-23-0001350. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2924938), filed by Steven Sotelo, Darlene Fernandez, Francine Kealoha, Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation, Fina Ongoy, Nathan Orden. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sarah O. Wang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tagama v. Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Tagama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Resorts Hospitality Corporation doing business as Marriott Koolina Beach Club
Represented By: Ashley C. Chinen
Represented By: Sarah O. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation
Represented By: Ashley C. Chinen
Represented By: Sarah O. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Fernandez
Represented By: Ashley C. Chinen
Represented By: Sarah O. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fina Ongoy
Represented By: Ashley C. Chinen
Represented By: Sarah O. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Orden
Represented By: Ashley C. Chinen
Represented By: Sarah O. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sotelo
Represented By: Ashley C. Chinen
Represented By: Sarah O. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francine Kealoha
Represented By: Ashley C. Chinen
Represented By: Sarah O. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Government Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?