Oliva v. County of Hawai'i Department of Parks & Recreation et al
Plaintiff: Karsten Oliva
Defendant: County of Hawai'i Department of Parks & Recreation, Maurice Messina, Mitch Roth, Lee Lord and Victor McDaniel
Case Number: 1:2023cv00477
Filed: November 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/22/2024. (adi)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
January 22, 2024 Filing 18 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order.The Court verifies and Plaintiff confirms the following mailing and contact information:Karsten Oliva75-5660 Kopiko St.Ste C-7 #535Kailua-Kona, HI 96740Ph: 808-217-5286Email: lifeguardtower@yahoo.comJury Selection/Trial is set for 4/21/2025 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kupono before DISTRICT JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/7/2025 at 10:00 AM in Aha Kupono before DISTRICT JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/10/2025 at 9:45 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 12/17/2024 at 11:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/22/2024. Discovery due by 11/22/2024.Other Matters:Early Settlement Conference set for May 3, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. before KJM by Video Conference (VTC). Confidential Settlement Conference statements due by April 26, 2024.The Confidential Settlement Conference Statements shall be delivered(one-set, double-sided)to the Clerk's Office and delivered electronically by emailing it to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.The courtroom manager will provide the applicable participants with instructions and information to connect by video prior to the scheduled video conference date.For all telephonic hearings set before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our Zoom Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896(adi)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
January 8, 2024 Filing 16 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Karsten Oliva. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Oliva, Karsten)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by County of Hawai'i Department of Parks & Recreation, Lee Lord, Victor McDaniel, Maurice Messina, Mitch Roth. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Idemoto, Steven)
January 6, 2024 Filing 14 Plaintiff Karsten Oliva's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Oliva, Karsten) Modified on 1/8/2024 (eta).
January 5, 2024 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) STATUS REPORT by Karsten Oliva. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Joint Rule 26f Conference)(Oliva, Karsten) Modified on 1/8/2024 (eta).
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 Defendants County of Hawaii, Department of Parks & Recreation; Maurice Messina; Mitch Roth; Lee Lord; and Victor McDaniel's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Idemoto, Steven) Modified on 1/8/2024 (eta).
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 EO: On January 3, 2024, Plaintiff Karsten Oliva ("Plaintiff") filed an #10 Application for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing ("Application"). After carefully reviewing the Application, the Court finds that Plaintiff meets all the technical requirements for e-filing. The Court thus GRANTS the Application. Plaintiff shall submit a CM/ECF Registration Form to the Clerk's Office. Plaintiff is required to abide by all rules applicable to utilization of the court's e-filing system. The Court reserves the right to revoke Plaintiff's e-filing privileges at any point. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 01/04/2024. (kjm3)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). This Notice of Electronic Filing was also emailed to Plaintiff Karsten Oliva at the email address of lifeguardtower@yahoo.com on 01/04/2024.
January 3, 2024 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Permission to E-file by Karsten Oliva. (apg)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mitch Roth. Mitch Roth waiver sent on 11/25/2023, answer due 1/24/2024. (eta)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maurice Messina. Maurice Messina waiver sent on 11/25/2023, answer due 1/24/2024. (eta)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor McDaniel. Victor McDaniel waiver sent on 11/25/2023, answer due 1/24/2024. (eta)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Lord. Lee Lord waiver sent on 11/25/2023, answer due 1/24/2024. (eta)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed by County of Hawai'i Department of Parks & Recreation. County of Hawai'i Department of Parks & Recreation waiver sent on 11/25/2023, answer due 1/24/2024. (eta)
November 24, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons).(cgc)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/22/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/24/2023. (cgc)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by Email to the email address of record listed on the (NEF) 11/24/2023. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
November 24, 2023 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 1918 re #1 Complaint. (cgc)
November 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DISCRIMINATION BASED ON NATIONAL ORIGIN AND AGE; RETALIATION; VIOLATIONS OF TITLE 18 SECTION 241 & SECTION 242; DEFAMATION; DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL against County of Hawai'i Department of Parks & Recreation, Lee Lord, Victor McDaniel, Maurice Messina, Mitch Roth - filed by Karsten Oliva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cgc)
November 24, 2023 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #4 Civil Waiver of Service Packet has been served by Email to Karsten Oliva. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cgc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliva v. County of Hawai'i Department of Parks & Recreation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karsten Oliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Hawai'i Department of Parks & Recreation
Represented By: Steven K. Idemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Messina
Represented By: Steven K. Idemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Roth
Represented By: Steven K. Idemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Lord
Represented By: Steven K. Idemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor McDaniel
Represented By: Steven K. Idemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?