Smith v. Macano
Plaintiff: Craig I. Smith
Defendant: Delbert K. Macano
Case Number: 1:2023cv00481
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 7 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES re #2 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/18/2024. The Court cannot FIND that Plaintiff is unable to pay the required fees and RECOMMENDS that the district court:1) DENY the Application, and2) GRANT Plaintiff leave to (a) pay the filing fee.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/19/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (jni)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/18/2024.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/18/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (jni)
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER is CONTINUED to 3/22/2024 at 8:30 AM. Scheduling conference statements must be filed by 3/15/2024.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 (toll-free).Meeting ID: 161 5641 6035. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(rt2)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/22/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/27/2023. (cgc)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served at the Clerk's office service counter. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel Under The Civil Rights Act of 1964; 42 U.S.C. 2000e-5(f)(1)(B); Declaration in Support of Request - by Plaintiff Craig I. Smith. (cgc)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Craig I. Smith. (cgc)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION against Delbert K. Macano - filed by Craig I. Smith.(cgc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Macano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig I. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delbert K. Macano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?