Bowa Estates Limited, et al. v. Association of Apartment Owners of Wailea Point Village, et al.
Plaintiff: Bowa Estates Limited, C. Donald Dempsey, Mayako Y. Dempsey, Joachim Rosch, Michelle Rosch and Thomas C. Ainsworth
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Wailea Point Village, Dale Knutson, Eileen Hantke, Jill Inskeep, Joseph Azar, Lowell McAdam, Michael Murray, Mike Avila, Rob King, Robbie Dein, Robert Hoffman, Roger Wery and Steve Wells
Case Number: 1:2023cv00582
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: MICAH WJ SMITH
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Case reassigned to JUDGE MICAH W.J. SMITH for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON no longer assigned to case Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00582-MWJS-RT on all further pleadings. (apg)
January 30, 2024 Filing 41 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/5/2024 is CONTINUED to 3/5/2024 at 8:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Trader. Scheduling conference statements must be filed by 2/27/2024.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 (toll-free).Meeting ID: 161 5641 6035. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(rt2)
January 22, 2024 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayako Y. Dempsey, Bowa Estates Limited, C. Donald Dempsey, Michelle Rosch, Joachim Rosch, Thomas C. Ainsworth. Steve Wells served on 1/12/2024. (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 22, 2024 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayako Y. Dempsey, Bowa Estates Limited, C. Donald Dempsey, Michelle Rosch, Joachim Rosch, Thomas C. Ainsworth. Robert Hoffman served on 1/12/2024. (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 22, 2024 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayako Y. Dempsey, Bowa Estates Limited, C. Donald Dempsey, Michelle Rosch, Joachim Rosch, Thomas C. Ainsworth. Robbie Dein served on 1/12/2024. (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 22, 2024 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayako Y. Dempsey, Bowa Estates Limited, C. Donald Dempsey, Michelle Rosch, Joachim Rosch, Thomas C. Ainsworth. Mike Avila served on 1/12/2024. (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 22, 2024 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayako Y. Dempsey, Bowa Estates Limited, C. Donald Dempsey, Michelle Rosch, Joachim Rosch, Thomas C. Ainsworth. Joseph Azar served on 1/12/2024. (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 22, 2024 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayako Y. Dempsey, Bowa Estates Limited, C. Donald Dempsey, Michelle Rosch, Joachim Rosch, Thomas C. Ainsworth. Association of Apartment Owners of Wailea Point Village served on 1/12/2024. (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 5, 2024 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Steve Wells. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to Roger Wery. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Robert Hoffman. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Robbie Dein. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Rob King. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Mike Avila. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to Michael Murray. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Lowell McAdam. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Joseph Azar. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Jill Inskeep. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Eileen Hantke. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Dale Knutson. (eta)
January 5, 2024 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Wailea Point Village. (eta)
January 4, 2024 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joachim Rosch, Michelle Rosch. (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C. Donald Dempsey, Mayako Y. Dempsey. (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thomas C. Ainsworth. (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 18 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 15 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 14 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Suetsugu, Anthony)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni) Modified on 12/11/2023 (eta).
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/5/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 12/8/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00582 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (jni)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2931886.), filed by Bowa Estates Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Suetsugu, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowa Estates Limited, et al. v. Association of Apartment Owners of Wailea Point Village, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bowa Estates Limited
Represented By: David R Lau
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Anthony F.T. Suetsugu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Donald Dempsey
Represented By: Anthony F.T. Suetsugu
Represented By: David R Lau
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayako Y. Dempsey
Represented By: Anthony F.T. Suetsugu
Represented By: David R Lau
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joachim Rosch
Represented By: Anthony F.T. Suetsugu
Represented By: David R Lau
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Rosch
Represented By: Anthony F.T. Suetsugu
Represented By: David R Lau
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C. Ainsworth
Represented By: Anthony F.T. Suetsugu
Represented By: David R Lau
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Wailea Point Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Hantke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Inskeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Dein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?