The Excellent Raj K. Patel v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Raj K. Patel
Defendant: United States, Joe Biden, Kamala Harris, All Cabinet Officers, Merrick B. Garland, Xavier Becerra, Dr. Vivek Murthy, Linda Thomas-Greenfield and All Biden Cabinet Officers
Case Number: 1:2023cv00613
Filed: December 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS FOR APPEAL - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/7/2024. Based on the foregoing, the court CERTIFIES that Plaintiff's appeal is frivolous, REVOKES his IFP status and DENIES Plaintiff leave to proceed IFP on appeal. The Clerk shall transmit a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal (No. 24-624).COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). Additionally, a copy of this Order has been sent to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) via: cmecf_ca9central@ca9.uscourts.gov. (jni)
February 7, 2024 Filing 23 USCA REFERRAL NOTICE as to #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Raj K. Patel; USCA No. 24-624: This matter is referred to the district court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3); see also Hooker v. American Airlines, 302 F.3d 1091, 1092 (9th Cir. 2002) (revocation of forma pauperis status is appropriate where district court finds the appeal to be frivolous). If the district court elects to revoke in forma pauperis status, the district court is requested to notify this court and the parties of such determination within 21 days of the date of this referral. If the district court does not revoke in forma pauperis status, such status will continue automatically for this appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). This referral shall not affect the briefing schedule previously established by this court. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).(jni)
February 5, 2024 Filing 22 Attorney Appeal Packet re #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Raj K. Patel; USCA No. 24-624. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 District Court Instructions for Civil Appeals, #3 Docket Sheet)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).(jni)
February 5, 2024 Filing 21 USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER as to #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Raj K. Patel; USCA No. 24-624. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).(jni)
February 5, 2024 Filing 20 USCA Case Number 24-624 for #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Raj K. Patel. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).(jni)
January 28, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order (1) Granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees; (2) Denying Plaintiff's Emergency Petitions for a Writ of Mandamus; (3) Dismissing Action Without Leave to Amend; and (4) Denying Additional Motions as Moot, #16 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, 18 Entering Order - by Raj K. Patel; USCA No. 24-624. Filing fee $ 605. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).(jni) Modified on 2/5/2024 (jni)
January 9, 2024 Filing 18 EO: On January 8, 2024, Plaintiff Raj K. Patel filed a Motion to Reconsider. See ECF No. #17 . Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider asks the court to reconsider its earlier January 8, 2024 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motions for Reconsideration, ECF No. #16 . Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, ECF No. 17, is without merit and is DENIED. The court will not entertain any further motions to reconsider in this closed case; any further motions to reconsider will be stricken. (JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
January 8, 2024 Filing 17 1. T.E.,E. MR. RAJ K. PATEL'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER DKT. 16; 2. EXHIBIT A (Order at Dkt. 16) - by Plaintiff Raj K. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A)(jni)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION re #14 , #15 - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/8/2024. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).(jni)
January 2, 2024 Filing 15 T.E.,E. MR. RAJ K. PATEL'S AMENDED MOTION TO RECONSIDER DKT. 12 - by Plaintiff Raj K. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A)(jni)
December 29, 2023 Filing 14 T.E.,E. MR. RAJ K. PATEL'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER DKT. 12 re #12 - by Plaintiff Raj K. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Amended Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A)(jni)
December 29, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 12/29/2023 pursuant to ECF #12 ORDER (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES; (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY PETITIONS FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS; (3) DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; AND (4) DENYING ADDITIONAL MOTIONS AS MOOT. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). (jni)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES; (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY PETITIONS FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS; (3) DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; AND (4) DENYING ADDITIONAL MOTIONS AS MOOT - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/29/2023. For the foregoing reasons, the court GRANTS Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 2, DENIES Plaintiff's Emergency Petitions, ECF Nos. 1, 7, and DISMISSES the action without leave to amend. Plaintiff's Additional Motions, ECF Nos. 3, 8 & 9, are DENIED as MOOT. The Clerk of Court shall close the case. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).(jni)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by Email (Attachments: #1 Technical Guide for Using Notices of Electronic Filing (NEF's) and Accessing Free Looks of Court Documents and Notices by Email) (jni)
December 27, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Order - by Raj K. Patel. (jni)
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 T.E., E. MR. RAJ K. PATEL'S MOTION TO PERFECT SERVICE WITH AMENDED CERT. OF SERVICE - by Plaintiff Raj K. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service (Amended))(jni) Modified on 12/27/2023 (jni)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 T.E., E. MR. RAJ K. PATEL'S MOTION TO PERFECT SERVICE - by Plaintiff Raj K. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jni)
December 26, 2023 Filing 7 EMERGENCY PRO SE AMENDED PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS - by Plaintiff Raj K. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Certificate of Service)(jni)
December 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00613JMS-KJM on all further pleadings.. (apg)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
December 22, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF A LAWSUIT AND REQUEST TO WAIVE SERVICE OF A SUMMONS, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(apg)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 2/26/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 12/22/2023. (apg)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
December 22, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing (E-file) by Raj K. Patel. (apg)
December 22, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Raj K. Patel. (apg)
December 22, 2023 Filing 1 EMERGENCY PRO SE PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDAMUS by Plaintiff Raj K. Patel. (apg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2023: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (apg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Excellent Raj K. Patel v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raj K. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Cabinet Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Vivek Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Thomas-Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Biden Cabinet Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?