Williams v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Pastor Timothy Williams
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv00028
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Filing 12 EO: In light of #11 Plaintiff's Response Showing Cause, the Court DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause that was issued in the Court's 2/16/2024 Minute Order, see ECF No. 10. The Court sets a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 4/22/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. The Court ORDERS the parties to hold their Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (FRCP) Rule 26(f) planning meeting no later than 4/1/2024. The following documents shall be filed no later than 4/15/2024: (1) the parties' report required under FRCP Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 26.1, which may be filed by either party, and (2) Plaintiff's scheduling conference statement. The Court has already received Defendant's scheduling conference statement, and Defendant need not submit another statement. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pastor Timothy Williams will be served by First Class Mail on March 8, 2024 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the NEF.
March 7, 2024 Filing 11 Plaintiff RESPONSE Showing Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed by March 8, 2024; Certificate of Service re 10 - filed by Timothy Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
February 16, 2024 Filing 10 EO: The Court has not received a Rule 16 Scheduling Statement from Plaintiff. Additionally, according to #8 Defendant's Report of Efforts to Hold a Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, Plaintiff did not respond to Defendant's efforts to schedule the Rule 26(f) Planning meeting with Plaintiff. Therefore, the Court VACATES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for February 21, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. This Conference will be rescheduled as appropriate. Additionally, the Court ORDERS PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with court rules. See Local Rule 81.1(a) ("Pro se litigants shall abide by all local, federal, and other applicable rules and/or statutes."). Local Rule 26.1(a) requires the parties to meet twenty-one days before the scheduling conference. Local Rule 26.1(b) requires Plaintiff to file a report within fourteen days after the meeting. According to #8 Defendant's Report of Efforts to Hold a Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, Plaintiff did not respond to Defendant's efforts to schedule this meeting with Plaintiff. Additionally, in ECF No. 7, the Court noted that the parties did not submit the required report and consequently extended the deadline to do so until 2/14/2024. In ECF No. 7, the Court also reminded the parties that Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements, which are required under Local Rule 16.2(b), were due on 2/14/2024. Insofar as Plaintiff has not complied with court rules to meet with Defendant or file the required report or scheduling statement, the Court ORDERS PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with court rules. Plaintiff shall file a response showing cause no later than 3/8/2024. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pastor Timothy Williams will be served by First Class Mail on February 16, 2024 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the NEF.
February 14, 2024 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATIONS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
February 14, 2024 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATIONS REPORT OF EFFORTS TO HOLD A RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
February 9, 2024 Filing 7 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 2/21/2024 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. The Court has not received the parties' report required under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 26.1. The parties' report shall be filed no later than 2/14/2024. The Court also reminds the parties that their Rule 16 scheduling conference statements are due 2/14/2024. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pastor Timothy Williams will be served by First Class Mail on February 9, 2024 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the NEF.
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Costco Wholesale Corporation for Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Cole, Christopher) Modified on 1/22/2024 (eta).
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni) Modified on 1/19/2024 (eta).
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/21/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/19/2024. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/19/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (jni)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00028 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/19/2024. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)(jni)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Cole, Christopher)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT from Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, case number 3CCV-23-0000392. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2947512), filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Cole, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration of Kristina Jung, #7 Certificate of Service)(Cole, Christopher)
January 19, 2024 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 5 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement, shall be served by First Class Mail to Timothy Williams, at the address of record on 1/19/2024. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pastor Timothy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?