Sarafin et al v. Hawaii Public Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Sinisio Sarafin and Legal Aid Society of Hawai'i
Defendant: Hawai'i Public Housing Authority, Hakim Ouansafi and Ryan Akamine
Case Number: 1:2024cv00066
Filed: February 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Filing 23 EO: In light of #19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 5/7/2024 to 7/16/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
April 8, 2024 Filing 22 EO: COURT ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULEOn 4/3/2025, Defendant, Hawai'i, Public Housing Authority filed Dkt. #19 ; a Motion to Dismiss.Court sets the following Motion hearing and briefing schedule:Opposition memorandum due: 4/22/2024.Reply memorandum due: 5/6/2024.A Motion hearing on Defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss is set for: 5/17/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference Hearing before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The Courtroom manager will provide participants with the instructions and information to connect by video in advance of the scheduled video conference. Participants must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(afe)
April 5, 2024 Filing 21 Errata re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ERRATA TO DEFENDANTS HAWAII PUBLIC HOUSING AUTHORITY, HAKIM OUANSAFI, AND RYAN AKAMINES MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cruz, Skyler)
April 5, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan G. Fujitani on behalf of Ryan Akamine, Hawai'i Public Housing Authority, Hakim Ouansafi on behalf of Ryan Akamine, Hawai'i Public Housing Authority, Hakim Ouansafi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fujitani, Dylan)
April 3, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Skyler G. Cruz appearing for Defendants Hakim Ouansafi, Hawai'i Public Housing Authority, Ryan Akamine (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Certificate of Service)(Cruz, Skyler)
March 20, 2024 Filing 18 EO: To allow time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 4/8/2024 to 5/7/2024 at 8:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
March 20, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Legal Aid Society of Hawai'i, Sinisio Sarafin . Ryan Akamine served on 3/18/2024. (Severson, Nicholas) Modified on 3/21/2024 (eta).
March 20, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Legal Aid Society of Hawai'i, Sinisio Sarafin. Hakim Ouansafi served on 3/18/2024. (Severson, Nicholas) Modified on 3/21/2024 (eta).
February 26, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sinisio Sarafin. Hakim Ouansafi served on 2/21/2024. (Severson, Nicholas) Modified on 2/28/2024 (eta).
February 26, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sinisio Sarafin. Ryan Akamine served on 2/21/2024. (Severson, Nicholas) Modified on 2/28/2024 (eta).
February 26, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sinisio Sarafin. Hawaii Public Housing Authority served on 2/21/2024. (Severson, Nicholas) Modified on 2/28/2024 (eta).
February 20, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Arnold Brancart on behalf of Legal Aid Society of Hawai'i, Sinisio Sarafin on behalf of Legal Aid Society of Hawai'i, Sinisio Sarafin. (Brancart, Christopher)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO CHRISTOPHER BRANCART, ESQ. re #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 2/20/2024. (eta)
February 16, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Christopher Brancart, Esq.) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2961969.Nicholas John Severson appearing for Plaintiff Legal Aid Society of Hawai'i (Severson, Nicholas)
February 13, 2024 Filing 9 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Legal Aid Society of Hawai'i. (Severson, Nicholas)
February 12, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ryan Akamine. (jni)
February 12, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Hakim Ouansafi. (jni)
February 12, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hawai'i Public Housing Authority. (jni)
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)
February 12, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/8/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/12/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00066 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
February 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2959251.), filed by Sinisio Sarafin, Legal Aid Society of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Summons - HPHA, #2 Summons - Ouansafi, #3 Summons - Akamine, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Severson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarafin et al v. Hawaii Public Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinisio Sarafin
Represented By: Cynthia Renee Moore
Represented By: Morgan Kiyomi Sasaki
Represented By: Nicholas John Severson
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legal Aid Society of Hawai'i
Represented By: Cynthia Renee Moore
Represented By: Morgan Kiyomi Sasaki
Represented By: Nicholas John Severson
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawai'i Public Housing Authority
Represented By: Dylan G. Fujitani
Represented By: Skyler G. Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hakim Ouansafi
Represented By: Dylan G. Fujitani
Represented By: Skyler G. Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Akamine
Represented By: Dylan G. Fujitani
Represented By: Skyler G. Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?