KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc. v. Big Island Electric, Inc.
Plaintiff: KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Big Island Electric, Inc. and Does 1-30
Cross Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Case Number: 1:2024cv00106
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Filing 20 EO: To allow sufficient time for parties to submit their #9 Consent Election Form, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 05/06/2024 IS CONTINUED TO 05/23/2024 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements, if not already filed, are due by 05/16/2024.Parties are to participate via telephone through the Courts Zoom Teleconference. Call-in information for this hearing is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 30, 2024 Filing 19 Consent Election Form
April 29, 2024 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc.. (Miyashiro, Casey)
April 29, 2024 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big Island Electric, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Big Island Electric, Inc. for Big Island Electric, Inc., Big Island Electric, Inc., Big Island Electric, Inc... (Yamada, Keith)
April 29, 2024 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement OF BIG ISLAND ELECTRIC, INC.. (Yamada, Keith)
April 29, 2024 Filing 15 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Miyashiro, Casey)
April 24, 2024 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Third Party Defendant Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (eta)
April 15, 2024 Filing 13 Big Island Electric ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, COUNTERCLAIM against KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc. by Big Island Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Summons, #7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Yamada, Keith) Modified on 4/17/2024. (jni)
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 Consent Election Form
March 15, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc.. Big Island Electric, Inc. served on 3/12/2024. (Oshiro, Anna)
March 6, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Big Island Electric, Inc. (jni)
March 6, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
March 6, 2024 Filing 8 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)
March 6, 2024 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/6/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/6/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00106 KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
March 6, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc.. (Miyashiro, Casey)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc.. (Miyashiro, Casey)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Miyashiro, Casey)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big Island Electric, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2970657.), filed by KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc..(Miyashiro, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc. v. Big Island Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPRS Hawaii Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Anna H. Oshiro
Represented By: Casey Tadakazu Miyashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Island Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Y. Yamada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?