Snow v. L'Oreal USA, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Snow
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Does 1 to 50
Case Number: 1:2024cv00110
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: MICAH WJ SMITH
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE as to Thomas B. Mayhew, Esq. re #17 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/6/2024. Attorney Thomas B. Mayhew added Pro Hac Vice for Defendant L'Oreal USA, Inc. (cgc)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE as to Cynthia A. Castillo, Esq. re #16 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/6/2024. Attorney Cynthia A. Castillo added Pro Hac Vice for Defendant L'Oreal USA, Inc. (cgc)
May 3, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Thomas B. Mayhew) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2998077.Michi Momose appearing for Defendant L'Oreal USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas B. Mayhew, #2 Attachment A to Declaration of Thomas B. Mayhew, #3 Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas B. Mayhew)(Momose, Michi)
May 3, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Cynthia A. Castillo) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2998058.Michi Momose appearing for Defendant L'Oreal USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cynthia A. Castillo, #2 Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cynthia A. Castillo)(Momose, Michi)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIRST STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND OTHER DEADLINES, AND RESETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE CALL - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/23/2024. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended to May 30, 2024.The initial scheduling conference shall be reset to Monday, June 26, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. HST.Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 09:30AM on 6/26/2024 by telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD.L'Oreal USA, Inc. answer due 5/30/2024.(jni)
April 23, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Michael Heihre on behalf of L'Oreal USA, Inc. on behalf of L'Oreal USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Heihre, C.)
April 23, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by L'Oreal USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent L'Oreal S.A. for L'Oreal USA, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Momose, Michi)
April 23, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michi Momose on behalf of L'Oreal USA, Inc. on behalf of L'Oreal USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Momose, Michi)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE as to Stephanie Sherman, Esq. re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/28/2024.Attorney Stephanie Sherman added Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. (jni)
March 27, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Snow. L'Oreal USA, Inc. served on 3/25/2024. (Hatch, Robert)
March 27, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [STEPHANIE SHERMAN, ESQ.] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2979879.Robert M. Hatch appearing for Plaintiff Jennifer Snow (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Counsel - Stephanie Sherman, Esq., #2 Exhibit "A")(Hatch, Robert)
March 8, 2024 Filing 8 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
March 8, 2024 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(eta)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/6/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/8/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to L'Oreal USA, Inc. (eta)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00110 MWJS-KJM on all further pleadings. (eta)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Snow on behalf of herself, and all others similarly situated, and the general public. (Hatch, Robert)
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Hatch, Robert)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; SUMMONS against LOREAL USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2971693.), filed by Jennifer Snow on behalf of herself, and all others similarly situated, and the general public. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hatch, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snow v. L'Oreal USA, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Snow
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Represented By: Robert M. Hatch
Represented By: Stephanie Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Represented By: C. Michael Heihre
Represented By: Cynthia A. Castillo
Represented By: Thomas B. Mayhew
Represented By: Michi Momose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?