Caterpillar Inc v. Aon Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Inc
Defendant: Aon Corporation, Aon Re Global Inc and Aon Risk Services Inc of Illinois
Case Number: 1:2007cv01274
Filed: October 12, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2007. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2007 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Atty Gregory Baker, re 11/7/07 Text Order. (SM, ilcd)
November 30, 2007 Filing 14 Letter re: MDL 1663 requesting file & certified copy of docket sheet (Clerk already forwarded file) (HK, ilcd)
November 20, 2007 Filing 13 Letter from CDIL forwarding complaint & certified copy of docket sheet to NJ for inclusion in MDL #1663 (HK, ilcd)
November 20, 2007 Remark: copy of 11/7/7 text order sent to attys: Baker & Reidy by Clerk (HK, ilcd)
November 19, 2007 Filing 12 Conditional Transfer Order entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the District Court in NJ. This case is terminated. Certified copy of docket sheet forwarded to NJ by Clerk w/complaint (HK, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2007: #1 page 3 added) (HK, ilcd).
November 8, 2007 Remark: Motion for Admission to practice and ECF registration mailed to conventional filing Atty Andrew Reidy ECF registration also mailed to Atty Gregory Baker. (SM, ilcd)
November 7, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Entry of Agreed Order, which is essentially a motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead, in that the Court finds that Defendants shall not be required to file an answer or otherwise plead until such time as shall be set by the transferee court in the MDL action following the finalization of the transfer process. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 11/07/07. (MMM2, ilcd)
November 7, 2007 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Aon Corporation, Aon Risk Services Inc of Illinois, Aon Re Global Inc. (Henderson, R)
November 7, 2007 Filing 10 MOTION to Enter Agreed Order by Defendants Aon Corporation, Aon Risk Services Inc of Illinois, Aon Re Global Inc. Responses due by 11/26/2007 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Henderson, R)
November 7, 2007 Filing 9 Designation of Lead Counsel by R Michael Henderson on behalf of Aon Corporation, Aon Risk Services Inc of Illinois, Aon Re Global Inc. (Henderson, R)
November 7, 2007 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by R Michael Henderson on behalf of Aon Corporation, Aon Risk Services Inc of Illinois, Aon Re Global Inc (Henderson, R)
October 31, 2007 Set Deadline: Aon Risk Services Inc of Illinois answer due 11/7/2007. (SM, ilcd)
October 30, 2007 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Caterpillar Inc as to Aon Re Global Inc 10/18/2007. (Miller, Michele)
October 30, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Aon Corporation answer due 11/7/2007; Aon Re Global Inc answer due 11/7/2007. (SM, ilcd)
October 29, 2007 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, Certificate of Interest, Designation of Lead Counsel and Civil Cover Sheet served on Tom Jarvis for Illinois Corporation Service C on 10-18-07, filed by Caterpillar Inc. (Miller, Michele)
October 29, 2007 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, Certificate of Interest, Designation of Lead Counsel and Civil Cover Sheet served on Tom Jarvis for Illinois Corp. Service C on 10-18-07, filed by Caterpillar Inc. (Miller, Michele)
October 17, 2007 Remark: Attorney Admissions packet (motion and ECF registration) mailed to attys Andrew Reidy and Gregory Baker by Clerk. (TK, ilcd)
October 12, 2007 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aon Corporation, Aon Risk Services Inc of Illinois, Aon Re Global Inc. (SM, ilcd)
October 12, 2007 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Caterpillar Inc. (SM, ilcd)
October 12, 2007 Filing 2 Designation of Lead Counsel by Robert G Abrams on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (SM, ilcd)
October 12, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $350, receipt #P020358), filed by Caterpillar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Inc v. Aon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Corporation
Represented By: Peter R Jennetten
Represented By: R Michael Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Re Global Inc
Represented By: Peter R Jennetten
Represented By: R Michael Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Risk Services Inc of Illinois
Represented By: Peter R Jennetten
Represented By: R Michael Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Daniel L Johns
Represented By: Robert G Abrams
Represented By: Gregory L Baker
Represented By: Andrew M Reidy
Represented By: Michele A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?