City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System v. Oberhelman et al
Plaintiff: City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System
Defendant: Peter A. Magowan, Daniel M. Dickinson, Jon M. Huntsman, Jr., Dennis A. Muilenburg, Caterpillar Inc, Charles D. Powell, Susan C. Schwab, David L. Calhoun, Joshua I. Smith, Eugene V. Fife, Juan Gallardo, Edward J. Rapp, William A. Osborn, Miles D. White, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Jesse J. Greene, Jr., David R. Goode and Edward B. Rust, Jr.
Interested Party: The Ellen J. Stokar IRA
Case Number: 1:2013cv01141
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
County: Peoria
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2014 Filing 28 Designation of Lead Counsel by John P Heil, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Heil, John)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 31, 2014. Stokar IRA's #17 Motion to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of This Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions, Withdrawal of Intervention, and for Appointment of Lead Counsel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Stokar IRA's request for a stay is DENIED; Stokar IRA's requests to consolidate only with Wolin's action and for appointment of its counsel as lead and liaison counsel are DENIED. Stokar IRA's #22 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Stay Consolidation is GRANTED. Iron Workers', Sterling Heights' and Wolin's joint #16 Motion to Consolidate Related Actions, Appoint Lead Counsel, and Set Briefing Schedule is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The following actions are consolidated: No. 13-1104, No. 13-1141, No. 13-1344, and No. 13-1509. By April 14, 2014, the parties are to notify the Court of any agreement upon, at most, two law firms to serve as co-lead counsel subject to the Court's authorization. The Court DEFERS entering a case scheduling order, including deadline for filing a consolidated complaint, until lead counsel has been appointed. (JD, ilcd)
March 21, 2014 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Verification)(Goodman, Benny)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 17, 2014. Plaintiff indicates in its #16 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Actions, Appoint Lead Counsel, and Set Briefing Schedule, that #16 supersedes Plaintiff's previously filed #10 Agreed Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and For Entry of a Case Scheduling Order, and #11 Unopposed Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel. Accordingly, #10 and #11 have been superseded by #16 and are MOOT. (JD, ilcd)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 11, 2014. The Ellen J. Stokar IRA's #22 Motion for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Its Motion to Stay Consolidation is GRANTED. The #1 Complaint does not adequately allege diversity jurisdiction. The Court orders Plaintiff to file by March 25, 2014, an Amended Complaint that includes factual allegations, assuming they exist, that address the inadequacies described herein. Otherwise, the Court will dismiss Plaintiff's case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (JD, ilcd)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to instructions from Chief Judge James E. Shadid, the assignment of this case to Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman is withdrawn due to his retirement. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 3/7/2014. (MC, ilcd)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on February 11, 2014. Defendants' #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint is suspended until the Court issues an order on the motions to consolidate. In that order, the Court will establish the new deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond. (JD, ilcd)
February 6, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants David L. Calhoun, Caterpillar, Inc., Daniel M. Dickinson, Eugene V. Fife, Juan Gallardo, David R. Goode, Jesse J. Greene, Jr., Jon M. Huntsman, Jr., Peter A. Magowan, Dennis A. Muilenburg, Douglas R. Oberhelman, William A. Osborn, Charles D. Powell, Edward J. Rapp, Edward B. Rust, Jr., Susan C. Schwab, Joshua I. Smith, Miles D. White. Responses due by 2/24/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ducayet, James)
November 26, 2013 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Its Motion To Stay Consolidation Of Related Actions Pending Proof Of This Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain Of The Related Actions Motion To Withdraw Of Intervention And For Appointment Of Lead Co filed by Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. (Seely, Kevin)
November 19, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Its Motion To Stay Consolidation Of Related Actions Pending Proof Of This Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain Of The Related Actions Motion To Withdraw Of Intervention And For Appointment Of Lead Counsel by Interested Party The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. Responses due by 12/6/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mulder, Michael)
November 11, 2013 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of this Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions MOTION to Withdraw of Intervention and For Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. (Seely, Kevin)
November 1, 2013 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #17 MOTION to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of this Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions MOTION to Withdraw of Intervention and For Appointment of Lead Counsel By Timothy Burke filed by Interested Party The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mulder, Michael)
November 1, 2013 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Local Rule 7.1. (Mulder, Michael)
November 1, 2013 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of this Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions MOTION to Withdraw of Intervention and For Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by Interested Party The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. (Mulder, Michael)
November 1, 2013 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of this Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions, MOTION to Withdraw of Intervention and For Appointment of Lead Counsel by Interested Party The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. Responses due by 11/18/2013 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mulder, Michael)
October 15, 2013 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Counsel and Set Briefing Schedule by Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. Responses due by 11/1/2013 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Marvin)
September 16, 2013 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by David L. Calhoun, Caterpillar, Inc., Daniel M. Dickinson, Eugene V. Fife, Juan Gallardo, David R. Goode, Jesse J. Greene, Jr., Jon M. Huntsman, Jr., Peter A. Magowan, Dennis A. Muilenburg, Douglas R. Oberhelman, William A. Osborn, Charles D. Powell, Edward J. Rapp, Edward B. Rust, Jr., Susan C. Schwab, Joshua I. Smith, Miles D. White. (Carlson, Walter)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Documents recently filed in this case exceeds 30 pages. The parties are reminded that if a document with attachments and exhibits is longer than 30 pages, a courtesy paper copy must be provided to the presiding judge's chambers. Local Rule CDIL 5.8. Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 6/4/13. (WW, ilcd)
May 16, 2013 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #11 MOTION To Appoint Lead Counsel CORRECTED by City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Goodman, Benny)
May 16, 2013 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT re #11 MOTION To Appoint Lead Counsel PART ONE by City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Goodman, Benny)
May 16, 2013 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #11 MOTION To Appoint Lead Counsel by City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Goodman, Benny)
May 16, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION To Appoint Lead Counsel by Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. Responses due by 6/3/2013 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goodman, Benny)
May 16, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Agreed Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and For an Entry of a Case Scheduling Order by Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. Responses due by 6/3/2013 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goodman, Benny)
May 16, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Timothy L Bertschy on behalf of All Defendants (Bertschy, Timothy)
May 14, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John P Heil, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Heil, John)
May 14, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nilofer Ibrahim Umar on behalf of All Defendants (Umar, Nilofer)
May 14, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James Wallace Ducayet on behalf of All Defendants (Ducayet, James)
May 14, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Walter C Carlson on behalf of All Defendants (Carlson, Walter)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 3/27/13: Pursuant to instructions from Chief Judge James E. Shadid, this case is transferred to U.S. District Judge Sara Darrow for all further proceedings. (TK, ilcd)
March 27, 2013 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to all Defendants and returned to Plaintiff's counsel by mail to make service upon the Defendants. (RK, ilcd)
March 26, 2013 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. (Barz, James)
March 26, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James E Barz on behalf of City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System (Barz, James)
March 26, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0753-1556174.), filed by City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons (Oberhleman), #4 Exhibit Summons (Rapp), #5 Exhibit Summons (Calhoun), #6 Exhibit Summons (Dickinson), #7 Exhibit Summons (Gallardo), #8 Exhibit Summons (Goode), #9 Exhibit Summons (Greene), #10 Exhibit Summons (Huntsman), #11 Exhibit Summons (Magowan), #12 Exhibit Summons (Muilenburg), #13 Exhibit Summons (Osborn), #14 Exhibit Summons (Powell), #15 Exhibit Summons (Rust), #16 Exhibit Summons (Schwab), #17 Exhibit Summons (Smith), #18 Exhibit Summons (White), #19 Exhibit Summons (Fife), #20 Exhibit Summons (Caterpillar))(Barz, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System v. Oberhelman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Magowan
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Dickinson
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon M. Huntsman, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis A. Muilenburg
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Powell
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Schwab
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Calhoun
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua I. Smith
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene V. Fife
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Gallardo
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Rapp
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Osborn
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles D. White
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R. Oberhelman
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse J. Greene, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Goode
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward B. Rust, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy L Bertschy
Represented By: Nilofer Ibrahim Umar
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: James Wallace Ducayet
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Ellen J. Stokar IRA
Represented By: Michael M Mulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Benny Copeline Goodman, III
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller
Represented By: James E Barz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?