Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Ameren Energy Resources Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Environmental Law & Policy Center, Respiratory Health Association and Sierra Club, Inc.
Defendant: Ameren Energy Resources Company LLC and Ameren Energy Resources Generating Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv01181
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 OPINION & ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 1/15/2019. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Remedy 184 and Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Injunctive Relief 180 are DENIED. However, pursuant to Federal Rul e of Civil Procedure 56(g), the Court finds no genuine dispute that no one, including Defendant, has yet paid any penalties for the violations found in this Courts decision on liability. Therefore, that fact will be treated as established in this case. See full Opinion & Order attached. (RK, ilcd)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/1/2018. Defendants Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Joel Schwartz 183 and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Ian Fisher 203 are DENIED. Plaintiffs requests for oral argument are DENIED and Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Respond to Defendants Objection to Consideration of Expert Reports on Summary Judgment 221 is GRANTED. See full Order & Opinion attached. (RK, ilcd)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Communications between Defendant's Testifying Experts and their Staff 177 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Answers to Questions on IPRG's Consideration of Measures to Control Opacity or Particulate Matter Pollution from the Edwards Power Plant 171 is DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Additional Deposition Time and Costs in Response to Improper and Obstructive Objections; Expedited Ruling Requested 160 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 7/18/2017. The Court finds that Defendants are not entitled to a jury trial on the determination of civil penalties. Thus, Defendants' demand for a jury trial on this issue is stricken. See full Order & Opinion attached. (RK, ilcd)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 8/23/2016. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 104 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court concludes thatPlaintiffs have standing to bring this lawsu it, grants summary judgment to Plaintiffs on all opacity exceedances in Counts One and Two for which they have moved for summary judgment, and grants summary judgment to Plaintiffs on all exceedances for which they have moved for summary judgment wit h respect to Count Three except for those opacity exceedances that occurred while the relevant unit was off-line. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 108 is GRANTED with respect to those particulate matter exceedances in Count Three that occurre d while the relevant unit was off-line, but otherwise DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike 119 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs motion to exclude certain expert testimony 113 remains pending. By September 1, 2016, Plaintiffs shall notify the Court whether this order has mooted any of the issues raised in that motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. (RK, ilcd)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER & OPINION granting 94 Motion entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/13/2015. (SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER) (VP, ilcd)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 8/17/2015. The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Movants Appeal of the Magistrate Judges Order Compelling Disclosure of Certain Communications. 80 . The order entered by Magistrate Judge To m Schanzle-Haskins on June 17, 2015 79 is MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: Document Request No. 1 in the Notice is modified to require that McFadden produce unprivileged documents that contain: (1) any statement made by the Named Standing Witness concerning E dwards; and (2) any communication from McFadden to a Named Standing Witness to which the Named Standing Witnessresponded with a statement concerning Edwards. McFadden need not produce thethird category of documents: any response by McFadden to any statement made bythe Named Standing Witnesses concerning Edwards.(RK, ilcd)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/28/2013. Magistrate Judge Cudmore's Report & Recommendation 28 is ADOPTED IN PART, and MODIFIED IN PART, AND Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 17 is DENIED. This matter is REFERRED BACK to Magistrate Judge Cudmore for further pretrial proceedings. (RK, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Ameren Energy Resources Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Ann Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Law & Policy Center
Represented By: Andrew B Armstrong
Represented By: Faith E Bugel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Respiratory Health Association
Represented By: Andrew B Armstrong
Represented By: Faith E Bugel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B Armstrong
Represented By: Faith E Bugel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameren Energy Resources Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameren Energy Resources Generating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?