The Ellen J. Stokar IRA v. Oberhelman et al
Plaintiff: The Ellen J. Stokar IRA
Defendant: Peter A. Magowan, Joshua I. Smith, Eugene V. Fife, Dennis A. Muilenburg, Caterpillar Inc, Charles D. Powell, Daniel M. Dickinson, Jesse J. Greene, David L. Calhoun, David R. Goode, Juan Gallardo, Susan C. Schwab, William A. Osborn, Miles D. White, Douglas R. Oberhelman, Jon M. Huntsman, Jr. and Edward B. Rust
Interested Party: Michael D. Wolin, Derivatively on Behalf of Caterpillar, Inc., Iron Workers Mid-South Pension Fund and City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System
Case Number: 1:2013cv01509
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
County: Peoria
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2014 Filing 16 Designation of Lead Counsel by John P Heil, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Heil, John)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 31, 2014. Stokar IRA's #5 Motion to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of This Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions, Withdrawal of Intervention, and for Appointment of Lead Counsel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Stokar IRA's request for a stay is DENIED; Stokar IRA's requests to consolidate only with Wolin's action and for appointment of its counsel as lead and liaison counsel are DENIED. Stokar IRA's request to withdraw intervention is GRANTED. Stokar IRA's #13 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Stay Consolidation is GRANTED. Iron Workers', Sterling Heights' and Wolin's joint Motion to Consolidate Related Actions, Appoint Lead Counsel, and Set Briefing Schedule is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The following actions are consolidated: No. 13-1104, No. 13-1141, No. 13-1344, and No. 13-1509. By April 14, 2014, the parties are to notify the Court of any agreement upon, at most, two law firms to serve as co-lead counsel subject to the Court's authorization. The Court DEFERS entering a case scheduling order, including deadline for filing a consolidated complaint, until lead counsel has been appointed. (JD, ilcd)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to instructions from Chief Judge James E. Shadid, the assignment of this case to Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman is withdrawn due to his retirement. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 3/7/2014. (MC, ilcd)
November 26, 2013 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Its Motion To Stay Consolidation Of Related Actions Pending Proof Of This Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain Of The Related Actions Motion To Withdraw Of Intervention And For Appointment Of Lead Co filed by Interested Parties City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System, Iron Workers Mid-South Pension Fund, Michael D. Wolin, Derivatively on Behalf of Caterpillar, Inc.. (Seely, Kevin)
November 19, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Its Motion To Stay Consolidation Of Related Actions Pending Proof Of This Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain Of The Related Actions Motion To Withdraw Of Intervention And For Appointment Of Lead Counsel by Plaintiff The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. Responses due by 12/6/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mulder, Michael)
November 19, 2013 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. David L. Calhoun waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Caterpillar Inc waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Daniel M. Dickinson waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Eugene V. Fife waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Juan Gallardo waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; David R. Goode waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Jesse J. Greene waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Peter A. Magowan waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Dennis A. Muilenburg waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Douglas R. Oberhelman waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; William A. Osborn waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Charles D. Powell waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Edward B. Rust waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Susan C. Schwab waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Joshua I. Smith waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013; Miles D. White waiver sent on 10/25/2013, answer due 12/24/2013. (Mulder, Michael)
November 11, 2013 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of this Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions MOTION to Withdraw of Intervention and for Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by Interested Parties Iron Workers Mid-South Pension Fund, City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System, Michael D. Wolin, Derivatively on Behalf of Caterpillar, Inc.. (Seely, Kevin)
November 7, 2013 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED against All Defendants, filed by The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Burke, Timothy)
November 6, 2013 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Burke, Timothy)
November 1, 2013 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #5 MOTION to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of this Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions MOTION to Withdraw of Intervention and for Appointment of Lead Counsel By Timothy Burke by The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mulder, Michael)
November 1, 2013 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Local Rule 7.1. (Mulder, Michael)
November 1, 2013 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of this Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions MOTION to Withdraw of Intervention and for Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by Plaintiff The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. (Mulder, Michael)
November 1, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Consolidation of Related Actions Pending Proof of this Court's Jurisdiction Over Certain of the Related Actions, MOTION to Withdraw of Intervention and for Appointment of Lead Counsel by Plaintiff The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. Responses due by 11/18/2013 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mulder, Michael)
October 30, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Waivers issued 10/30/2013. DUE: Miscellaneous Deadline 11/29/2013 (JRK, ilcd)
October 30, 2013 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Ellen J. Stokar IRA Proof of Service of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons to James W. Ducayet (Mulder, Michael)
October 29, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Timothy Joseph Burke on behalf of The Ellen J. Stokar IRA (Burke, Timothy)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 10/25/13: Pursuant to instructions from Chief Judge James E. Shadid, this case is reassigned to U.S. District Judge Sara Darrow for all further proceedings. (TK, ilcd)
October 24, 2013 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. (Mulder, Michael)
October 24, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-1689999.), filed by The Ellen J. Stokar IRA. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mulder, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Ellen J. Stokar IRA v. Oberhelman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Magowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua I. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene V. Fife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis A. Muilenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse J. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R. Oberhelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon M. Huntsman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward B. Rust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael D. Wolin, Derivatively on Behalf of Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Iron Workers Mid-South Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: City of Sterling Heights General Employees' Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ellen J. Stokar IRA
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Burke
Represented By: Michael M Mulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?