Employers Preferred Insurance Company v. C&K Hotel Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Employers Preferred Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
C&K Hotel Group, LLC and Corine Watts |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv01500 |
Filed: |
December 7, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of Illinois |
Office: |
Peoria Office |
County: |
McLean |
Presiding Judge: |
Jonathan E. Hawley |
Presiding Judge: |
Joe Billy McDade |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
56
ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/13/2017. For the reasons stated, this Court made no manifest errors of law or fact, nor are there any extraordinary circumstances present to warrant relief from the Courts Opinion and Order dat ed September 14, 2017 52 that denied CKsMotion for Summary Judgment 46 and granted EPICs Motion for SummaryJudgment 45 . Therefore, Defendant C&K Hotel Group, LLCs Motion AndBrief In Support Of Its Motion To Reconsider Or Otherwise Re-Hear, Amend,Vacate The Courts September 14, 2017 Summary Judgment 54 is DENIED.See full Order & Opinion attached.(RK, ilcd)
|
September 14, 2017 |
Filing
52
ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 9/14/17. The Court GRANTS Employers Preferred Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment 45 and DENIES C&K Hotel Group, LLC' s Motion for Summary Judgment 46 . Defendant Corine Watts did not submit any brief in support or opposition to either motion for summary judgment and therefore waived any right she may have had to not be bound by the forthcoming Order of this Court. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (FDS, ilcd)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
16
ORDER and OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/25/16. Defendant C & K Hotel Group, LLC's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 9 and Defendant Corine Watts's Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdi ction Of Defendant 13 are DENIED. The Court notes that the docket reveals Defendants have failed to answer the Amended Complaint. The Court hereby orders the Defendants to answer the Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order and Opinion. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (FDT, ilcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?