National Cooperative Bank, N.A. f/k/a NCB, FSB v. Matthews

Plaintiff: National Cooperative Bank, N.A. f/k/a NCB, FSB
Defendant: Gary Matthews
Case Number: 1:2017cv01330
Filed: July 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jonathan E. Hawley
Presiding Judge: James E. Shadid
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 18 , Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. See full written order. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 03/02/2018. (RT, ilcd)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/28/2017. The Court may grant leave to amend defective allegations of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1653. See also, Leaf v. Supreme Court of State of Wis., 979 F.2d 5 89, 595 (7th Cir. 1992) ("leave to amend defective allegations of subject matter jurisdiction should be freely given") (citations omitted). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint not later than fourteen (14) days (8/14/2017) from the date of entry of this Order. In the Amended Complaint, the Plaintiff shall properly allege the basis for the Court's jurisdiction. See full written Order. (RT, ilcd)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/18/2017. The Court may grant leave to amend defective allegations of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1653. See also, Leaf v. Supreme Court of State of Wis., 979 F.2d 5 89, 595 (7th Cir. 1992) ("leave to amend defective allegations of subject matter jurisdiction should be freely given") (citations omitted). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint not later than fourteen (14) days (8/2/2017) from the date of entry of this Order. In the Amended Complaint, the Plaintiff shall properly allege the basis for the Court's jurisdiction. See full written Order.(RT, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Cooperative Bank, N.A. f/k/a NCB, FSB v. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Cooperative Bank, N.A. f/k/a NCB, FSB
Represented By: Jordan G McCarthy
Represented By: David M Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?