Mojapelo v. Avis Car Rental
Plaintiff: Charles Mojapelo
Defendant: Avis Car Rental
Case Number: 1:2018cv01029
Filed: January 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Peoria Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E. Hawley
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/30/19. Defendant's motions 63 and 64 are GRANTED. The practical consequence of this ruling is that Plaintiff's potential recovery is limited to those damages allowed in the stat ute, and does not include punitive damages, damages for emotional distress, or attorney's fees. Plaintiff's motions 65 and 66 are DENIED. His request to find certain documents admissible and his hearsay objection to the reasons for his termination are denied without prejudice and may be raised at trial. The misfiled 69 is STRICKEN AS IMPROVIDENTLY FILED.SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (FDS, ilcd)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 9/4/2019. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Request to Amend Complaint (Doc. 56 ) is DENIED. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JRK, ilcd)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 5/17/2019. IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 35 ) is GRANTED on Plaintiff's discrimination and FCRA claims and DENIED on Plaintiff's withheld wage claim. Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 49 ) is DENIED. Because the Court found it unnecessary to consider the documents at issue in Plaintiff's Motion to Accept Documents (Doc. 47 ), it is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JRK, ilcd) Modified on 5/17/2019 to clarify filing as also an opinion(JRK, ilcd).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/2/2018: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 6 ) is DENIED and Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Doc. 9 ) is DENIED as MOOT.(SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER & OPINION.) (MA, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mojapelo v. Avis Car Rental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Mojapelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Car Rental
Represented By: David L Christlieb
Represented By: Kyle Joseph Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?