Crawford v. United States of America
Petitioner: Antonio D Crawford
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01033
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Petitioner has filed a Motion to Dismiss #6 , indicating he wishes to dismiss his Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 #1 . Petitioner filed his Petition in the United States District Court for the District of Vermont, but it was transferred here because the District of Vermont did not have jurisdiction. Petitioner does not wish to pursue his Petition in this Court. Petitioners Motion #6 is GRANTED, and his Petition #1 is DISMISSED. As Respondent has not filed an answer, the Petition is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(i). This matter is now CLOSED. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 2/20/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Petition by Petitioner Antonio D Crawford. Responses due by 3/1/2019 (MAS, ilcd)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. He has not paid the $5 filing fee, but has filed a Motion to proceed in forma pauperis #1 without the required certified copy of his six-month prison trust fund ledger. Petitioner also filed a Motion to Compel #2 , seeking an order compelling Stateville Correctional Center and Pontiac Correctional Center to release his six-month prison trust fund ledger. Petitioner states that he has been unable to attain this himself, but has not indicated what efforts he has taken or how he has been impeded from obtaining this documentation. The Court finds that Petitioner has not shown a need for an order compelling the correctional centers to provide documentation that they regularly provide to prisoners without a court order. Accordingly, Petitioner's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis #1 and Motion to Compel #2 are DENIED without prejudice. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before March 15, 2019, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 2/14/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
February 12, 2019 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification regarding #5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Habeas Petition received from the District of Vermont with numerous pages upside down throughout the petition. Clerk rotated the pages to the correct position and replaced the document. (MAS, ilcd)
February 12, 2019 Remark: Petitioner's Habeas Petition 2241 was received on 1/2/2019 and filed under seal in the District of Vermont per procedures. The case was transferred to the Central District of Illinois on 1/29/2019, with the petition still under seal. Clerk received the unsealed petition on 2/11/2019 and, it has now been docketed as d/e #5 . (MAS, ilcd)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Antonio D Crawford.(MAS, ilcd) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/12/2019) (MAS, ilcd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2019: #1 Exhibit) (MAS, ilcd).
January 29, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. (MAS, ilcd)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Vermont; Case Number 5:19-cv-00001. . Modified on 1/31/2019 (MAS, ilcd).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: #1 MOTION to Construe Application Grant in Forma Pauperis and #2 MOTION to Compel Institutions to Release Six Month Trust Fund Account. This court lacks jurisdiction to adjudicate Mr. Crawford's habeas corpus petition. The Clerk is directed to close all pending motions and transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/26/2019. (esb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Compel Institutions to Release Six Month Trust Fund Account filed by Antonio D. Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Antonio D. Crawford) (esb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Construe Application Grant in Forma Pauperis filed by Antonio D. Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Antonio D. Crawford, #2 Proposed Petition (image is sealed)) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio D Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kimberly A Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?