United States of America v. Kensinger et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Kasey R Kensinger
Case Number: 1:2019cv01102
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Other Deadline set for Plaintiff to effectuate service on Deft Kensinger by 8/26/2019. (KB, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 the United States' Motion to Extend the Deadline to Complete Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Obtain Either a Signed Waiver of Service of Summons or Service of Process on the Defendant-Mortgagor, Kasey R. Kensinger. Plaintiff United States must effectuate service on Defendant Kensinger by 8/26/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/25/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to extend the deadline to complete service of process pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m) and obtain either a signed Waiver of Service of Summons or Service of Process on the Defendant-Mortgagor, Kasey R. Kensinger by Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt)(Hoff, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Bank of America, N.A. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (ED, ilcd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A. and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Kasey R. Kensinger on 6/4/19. (Hoff, David)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David H Hoff on behalf of United States of America (Hoff, David)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Bank of America, N.A. on March 29, 2019. (Klein, Kimberly)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Kasey R. Kensinger on March 29, 2019. (Klein, Kimberly)
March 27, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley. (KB, ilcd)
March 27, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Judge James E. Shadid no longer assigned to the case. (VH, ilcd)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 3/27/2019. I hereby recuse myself from this case and reassign this case to Judge Darrow for all furtherproceedings.(VH, ilcd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of foreclosure by United States of America. (VH, ilcd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VH, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kensinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasey R Kensinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kimberly A Klein
Represented By: David H Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?