Adair v. Tangman et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Adair
Defendant: Jonathan Gallup, Gregory Tangman, Teri A Kennedy, Jade Culkin and Bryan Collier
Case Number: 1:2019cv01114
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/27/2019. Plaintiff's motion for status is granted. #7 . The Court has received Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis, which will be ruled on in a separate order. (KE, ilcd)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Patrick Adair.(SKN, ilcd)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/18/2019. This case was closed on June 13, 2019 for Plaintiff's failure to keep his address current. The Court then received a notice of change of address. The clerk is directed to reopen this case. By July 8, 2019, Plaintiff is directed to file an updated petition to proceed in forma pauperis setting forth his current income, assets, and debts. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis form.(SAG, ilcd)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE: The Clerk of the Court has been notified of Plaintiff's change of address in case number 18-3235. As a courtesy to Plaintiff, and in order to maintain accurate information in the Court Electronic Filing system, Plaintiff's address has been updated in this closed case. No further action is required. (KE, ilcd)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Status by Plaintiff Patrick Adair. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (SKN, ilcd)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Patrick Adair. New address reported: 4246 W. West End, Chicago, IL, 60624. (SKN, ilcd)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: According to the IDOC website, Plaintiff was paroled on June 10, 2019. Plaintiff did not file his new address before he was paroled, nor has he filed his new address as of the entry of this order. Plaintiff was warned in the Notice of Case Opening #2 that this case could be dismissed if Plaintiff did not keep his address current. This case is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to keep the Court informed of Plaintiff's address. The clerk is directed to close this case. No judgment will enter. Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 06/13/2019. (SKN, ilcd)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for the Court to appoint counsel is denied #5 , with leave to renew after Plaintiff demonstrates that he has made reasonable efforts to find counsel on his own. Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). This typically requires writing to several lawyers and attaching the responses. Plaintiff asserts that attorneys have declined to represent him, but Plaintiff does not set forth the names of the attorneys he contacted or when he contacted them, and he does not attach any copies of responses. If Plaintiff renews his motion, he should set forth how far he has gone in school, any jobs he has held inside and outside of prison, any classes he has taken in prison, and any prior litigation experience he has. Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 04/25/2019. (SKN, ilcd)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Patrick Adair. Responses due by 4/17/2019 (SKN, ilcd)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $7.50. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/3/2019. (SKN, ilcd) Modified on 4/3/2019 to correct filing date.(SKN, ilcd).
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Patrick Adair (SKN, ilcd)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Patrick Adair.(SKN, ilcd)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield, IL, 62701. Merit Review Deadline set for 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SKN, ilcd)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryan Collier, Jade Culkin, Jonathan Gallup, Teri A Kennedy and Gregory Tangman filed by Patrick Adair.(SKN, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adair v. Tangman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Gallup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Tangman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri A Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jade Culkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?