United States of America v. Gabbert et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Randel A. Gabbert, Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc. and Joann M. Gabbert
Case Number: 1:2019cv01138
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/26/2019 at 10:15 AMvia telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 7/23/19. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/25/2019. (WG, ilcd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Joann M. Gabbert, Randel A. Gabbert, Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc..(Atkins, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William W P Atkins on behalf of Joann M. Gabbert, Randel A. Gabbert, Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc. (Atkins, William)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by United States of America as to Joann M. Gabbert 6/7/2019. (Wille, Robert)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Randel A. Gabbert served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Wille, Robert)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joann M. Gabbert, Randel A. Gabbert, Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc. (VH, ilcd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Randel Gabbert Summons, #3 Joann Gabbert Summons, #4 Gabbert & Son Summons)(Wille, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gabbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randel A. Gabbert
Represented By: William W P Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc.
Represented By: William W P Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann M. Gabbert
Represented By: William W P Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Joseph Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?