Byrd v. Warden of FCI Pekin
Petitioner: Wardell T Byrd
Respondent: Warden of FCI Pekin
Case Number: 1:2019cv01161
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re receipt for filing fee, Order and Judgment. Clerk re-mailed out documents to Plaintiff with the correct ID Number on it. CMEFC has been updated. (KB, ilcd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT entered. (KB, ilcd)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/6/2019. For these reasons, the Court finds Petitioner Wardell R. Byrd's Petition (Doc. 1) is premature, and it is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is CLOSED. (KB, ilcd)
June 5, 2019 Filing fee paid on 6/5/2019: $5.00, receipt number 44626003537 for Petitioner Wardell T Byrd. (KB, ilcd)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 5/17/2019. Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. He states in his filing that he has "put into process the requisite filing fee of $5," however the Court has note yet received the fee. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before June 17, 2019, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. (KB, ilcd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Wardell T Byrd.(ED, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Warden of FCI Pekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of FCI Pekin
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wardell T Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?