Price v. Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Brokaw Price
Defendant: Joseph A. Scharf and Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01162
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by William Brokaw Price.(Walton, Mark)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: A Motion Hearing on the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Joseph A. Scharf and Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc. #6 is set for Tuesday, 8/20/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom B in Peoria before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 6/27/2019. (MNS, ilcd)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff William Brokaw Price. (Walton, Mark)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER STRIKING/VACATING DOCUMENT entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 6/26/2019: Dft William Brokaw Price's 6/25/2019 filing, #13 Response, bears the electronic signature of one attorney but was filed under the CM/ECF login of another. This is prohibited. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to STRIKE the filing. Counsel is directed re-file the pleading in compliance with Local Rule 11.4. (JRK, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED 6/26/2019: RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff William Brokaw Price. (McCoy, Robert) Modified on 6/26/2019 (JRK, ilcd).
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Richard T Marvel on behalf of All Defendants (Marvel, Richard)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Joseph A. Scharf and Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc.(Marvel, Richard) Modified on 6/28/2019 to include that Answer is also for Dft Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc.(JRK, ilcd).
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Notice of Answer, Counterclaim and Motion for Joinder (Marvel, Richard)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Proposed Order by Joseph A. Scharf. (Marvel, Richard) Modified on 6/12/2019 to change from pretrial order to order (VH, ilcd).
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Joseph A. Scharf. (Marvel, Richard)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Disclosure Statement (Marvel, Richard)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Joseph A. Scharf and Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc. Responses due by 6/25/2019 (Marvel, Richard) Modified on 6/25/2019 to reflect both defendants filed motion to dismiss (VH, ilcd).
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE for Motion to Dismiss (Marvel, Richard)
May 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to the Summons Returned Executed. Parties served 5/21/2019. Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc. answer due 6/11/2019; Joseph A. Scharf answer due 6/11/2019. (JRK, ilcd)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by William Brokaw Price: Joseph A. Scharf served on on 05/21/2019. (McCoy, Robert) Modified on 5/24/2019 to correct docket language as the incorrect event was chosen by counsel(JRK, ilcd).
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by William Brokaw Price: Carri G. Scharf served on on 05/21/2019. (McCoy, Robert) Modified on 5/24/2019 to correct docket language as the incorrect event was chosen by counsel(JRK, ilcd).
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc., Joseph A. Scharf. (VH, ilcd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 14626034461) filed by William Brokaw Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VH, ilcd)
May 13, 2019 Judge Michael M. Mihm and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley added. (VH, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Scharf
Represented By: Richard T Marvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Richard T Marvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brokaw Price
Represented By: Robert B McCoy
Represented By: Mark D Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?