Warren v. MBM Associates Inc

Plaintiff: Julius Warren
Defendant: Select Remedy, Select Staffing, M.B.M Associates, Inc. d/b/a and MBM Associates Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01208
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Eric I Long
3 Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held 8/15/19 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by John Coghlan. Appearance for Defendant by Andrew Cockroft. Rule 16 conference held by telephone. Plan approved; dates set. Plaintiff to file amended complaint by 8/29/19. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by: 7/25/2019. Amended pleadings due by: 9/6/2019. Joinder of parties due by: 9/6/2019. Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by: 3/1/2020. Case dispositive motions due by: 4/15/2020. Status Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Bench Trial set for 9/22/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Trial estimated 3 days. (Tape #UR-B 11:33 AM.) (SKR, ilcd)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/26/19. At the parties' request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for August 1, 2019, is RESCHEDULED to August 15, 2019, at 11:30 A.M. by telephone from Urbana (Court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (KM, ilcd)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/26/2019. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #8 and pursuant to the Order #2 scheduling this matter for a Rule 16 hearing conference by personal appearance on August 1, 2019, at 10:45 A.M., the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on the same date at the same time. The Court will initiate the call.(JMB, ilcd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by MBM Associates Inc. (Cockroft, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 for Select Staffing and Select Remedy by MBM Associates Inc. (DeGroff, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant MBM Associates Inc. (DeGroff, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant MBM Associates Inc. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGroff, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew Randall Cockroft on behalf of All Defendants (Cockroft, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/25/19. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #3 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 7/19/19. (TC, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (UNOPPOSED) by Defendant MBM Associates Inc. Responses due by 7/9/2019 (DeGroff, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/20/19 setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 8/1/19 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (TC, ilcd)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Defendants' Notice of Removal #1 states that this case is being removed from the Circuit Court of the Twenty-First Judicial Circuit - Kankakee County, Illinois. The Defendants filed their Notice of Removal in the Peoria Division of the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. 28 USC 1441(a) provides "any civil action brought in a State court of which the district courts of the United States have original jurisdiction[] may be removed by the defendant or the defendants, to the district court of the United States for the district and division embracing the place where such action is pending." See also 28 USC 1446(a). Because Kankakee County (and the entirety of the Twenty-First Judicial Circuit) is located within the Urbana Division (see Local Rule 40.1(D)), the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Urbana Division of the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/20/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Kankakee County, case number 2018L-139 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3131702), filed by Select Remedy, Select Staffing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DeGroff, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KM, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. MBM Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Remedy
Represented By: Christopher J DeGroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Staffing
Represented By: Christopher J DeGroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B.M Associates, Inc. d/b/a
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBM Associates Inc
Represented By: Andrew Randall Cockroft
Represented By: Christopher J DeGroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Warren
Represented By: John Shea Coghlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?