Brent, et al. vs. Wexford, et al.
Plaintiff: Joe N Sherrod, Michael Brent, John Theis, Edward Harris, Delmar Gray, Charles Kidd, Dennis McArdle, Nicholas Andrews, Oscar Patton, Christopher Alexander, Jason Ward, Harold Oliver, Luis VIllavicencio-Se, Willie Johnson, Stanley Miller, Pascual Videgaray, Carl Rogers, Carlos Jenkins, Blackie Veach, Leander Carter and Brayonne Murff
Defendant: Alfonso David, Andrew Tilden, Wexford Health Sources Inc, Dr Louis Shicker, Funk Arthur, Unknown Doctors (Jane/Joe 1-10), Sherri Lynn, Unknown Healthcare Unit Administrators (Jane/Joe Doe 16-20), Dr Kul Sood, Unknown Wexford Employees (Jane/Joe Doe 21-25), Michael Puisis, John Trost and Unknown Medical Directors (Jane/Joe 11-15)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01212
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harold A Baker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 7/26/2019. The Court sets this matter for a Rule 16 scheduling conference on Thursday, September 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., by telephone from Urbana. Call-in instructions will be forwarded prior to the telephone conference. No writ to issue as Plaintiff is represented by counsel. (KE, ilcd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Joseph Muldoon, III (Muldoon, John)
July 10, 2019 Minute entry for proceedings held on 7/10/2019 before Judge Baker. Appearance for the Plaintiffs by Thomas Pliura, Frank Madden and John Muldoon, III. Appearance for the Defendants by Remy Taborga, Brent Colbert, Megan Murphy, Joseph Rupcich, Robert Tengesdal and Colleen Shannon. Status conference held. Status of the case discussed. The Court wants to consolidate all hernia cases in the Central District of Illinois. Plaintiffs have no objection. Defendants object to the consolidation for the reasons stated on the record. The Court advises that the parties may file any objections that they have to the consolidation. Attorney Pliura advises the Court that he will accept representation on any additional hernia case where the plaintiffs are currently pro se.(Tape #UR-C: 10:04AM.) (JMB, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 6/25/2019 granting counsels' #86 motion for leave to withdraw as attorney for Defendants Wexford, Sood, David, Tilden, Funk and Trost. The clerk is directed to terminate Attorneys Samuel J. Tallman and Jesse B. Guth as counsel for these Defendants. (SAG, ilcd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Tengesdal, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 85 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-03546.
June 21, 2019 Filing 84 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (sxb, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 6/21/2019. Pursuant to #81 Order of Judge Pallmeyer of the Northern District of Illinois, transferring the claims of Plaintiffs Leander Carter and Nicholas Andrews to the Southern District of Illinois, Plaintiffs Carter and Andrews are dismissed from this case. The clerk is directed to terminate Plaintiffs Carter and Andrews and change the caption of the case to Brent v. Wexford, et al. This matter is set for a telephone status conference on July 10, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. The clerk will forward calling instructions to counsel prior to the hearing.(SAG, ilcd)
June 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (SAG, ilcd)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/21/2019. This case is reassigned to Judge Harold A. Baker for further proceedings. The clerk is directed to remove the referral to Magistrate Judge Long.(SAG, ilcd)
June 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long no longer assigned to case. (SAG, ilcd)
June 21, 2019 Remark: Attorney Samuel Tallman is not admitted to practice in this district, and has been sent the Attorney Admission packet, including the ECF Registration form. (SAG, ilcd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 83 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Southern District of Illinois the electronic record. (sxb, )
January 22, 2019 Electronic Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Southern District of Illinois as case number 3:19cv63, filed 1/22/2019 (ek, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/7/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: The claims of Leander Carter and Nicholas Andrews are hereby transferred to the United States District Court of the Southern District of Illinois for all further proceedings. The claims of all remaining plaintiffs, are hereby transferred to the United States District Court of the Central District of Illinois for all further proceedings. Enter Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/7/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 80 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Ruling held on 12/18/2018. Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D., and Arthur Funk, M.D.'s motion for severance of Plaintiffs' claims #69 is stricken without prejudice. Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D., and Arthur Funk, M.D.'s motion for transfer of venue #72 is granted. Proposed order to be submitted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 79 REPLY by Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc to memorandum in support of motion,, #73 , MOTION by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc to transfer case Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden, M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D. and #72 , response in opposition to motion,, #78 (Miller, Christopher)
December 5, 2018 Filing 78 RESPONSE by Christopher Alexander, Nicholas Andrews, Michael Brent, Leander Carter, Delmar Gray, Edward Harris, Carlos Jenkins, Willie Johnson, Charles Kidd, Dennis McArdle, Stanley Miller, Brayonne Murff, Harold Oliver, Oscar Patton, Carl Rogers, Joe N Sherrod, John Theis, Luis VIllavicencio-Se, Blackie Veach, Pascual Videgaray, Jason Wardin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc to transfer case Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden, M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D. and #72 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Muldoon, John)
November 14, 2018 Filing 77 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 11/14/2018. Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D., and Arthur Funk, M.D.'s motion for severance of Plaintiffs' claims #69 is entered and continued. Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D., and Arthur Funk, M.D.'s motion for transfer of venue #72 is entered and continued for briefing. Response to be filed by or on 12/5/2018; reply to be filed by or on 12/12/2018; ruling set for 12/18/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 76 EXHIBIT by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc Amended Exhibit G to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue Dkt. 73 regarding memorandum in support of motion,, #73 (Miller, Christopher)
November 7, 2018 Filing 75 EXHIBIT by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc Amended Exhibit G to Memorandum in Support of Motion for Severance to Plaintiffs' Claims Dkt. 70 regarding memorandum in support of motion,, #70 (Miller, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher M Miller for presentment of motion to transfer case, #72 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/14/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Miller, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM by Wexford Health Sources Inc in support of motion to transfer case, #72 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden, M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D. and Arthur Funk, M.D.'s Motion for Transfer of Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Miller, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc to transfer case Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden, M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D. and Arthur Funk, M.D.'s Motion for Transfer of Venue (Miller, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher M Miller for presentment of motion to sever, #69 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/14/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Miller, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM by Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc in support of motion to sever, #69 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Wexford Health sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden, M.D., John Trost, m.D., Kul Sood, M.D. and Arthur Funk, M.D.'s Motion for Severance of Plaintiffs' Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Miller, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc to sever Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden, M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D. and Arthur Funk, M.D.'s Motion for Severance of Plaintiffs' Claims (Miller, Christopher)
August 22, 2018 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 8/2/2018. Leave is granted to take the deposition of person who is in custody. Status hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 5/16/2018. Status hearing set for 8/22/2018 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
March 26, 2018 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: On the court's own motion, status hearing set for 5/15/2018 is stricken and re-set to 5/16/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 65 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER : Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/23/2018. Mailed notice, (etv, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Unopposed motion for qualified protective order pursuant to HIPAA #62 is granted without an appearance. Mailed notice. (etv, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 63 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Christopher M Miller for presentment of motion for protective order #62 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/1/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Miller, Christopher)
February 22, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc for protective order Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Qualified Protective Order Pursuant to HIPAA (Miller, Christopher)
February 16, 2018 Filing 61 ANSWER to amended complaint Defendant Arthur Funk, M.D.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Funk Arthur(Miller, Christopher)
February 16, 2018 Filing 60 ANSWER to amended complaint Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc.'s Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Wexford Health Sources Inc(Miller, Christopher)
February 16, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to amended complaint Defendant John Trost, M.D.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by John Trost(Miller, Christopher)
February 16, 2018 Filing 58 ANSWER to amended complaint Defendant Andrew Tilden, M.D.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Andrew Tilden(Miller, Christopher)
February 16, 2018 Filing 57 ANSWER to amended complaint Defendant Kul Sood, M.D.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Kul Sood(Miller, Christopher)
February 16, 2018 Filing 56 ANSWER to amended complaint Defendant Alfonso David, M.D.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Alfonso David(Miller, Christopher)
February 15, 2018 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Rule 16 conference held on 2/15/2018. Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1): 3/16/2018 for the plaintiffs named in the original complaint; 4/16/2018 for the newly named plaintiffs in the amended complaint. Amendment of the pleadings: 3/26/2018; Joining additional parties: 3/26/2018; Close of fact discovery 9/16/2019. Disclosure of Plaintiff's experts 10/16/2019; Disclosure of Plaintiff's expert reports 10/16/2019; Plaintiff's experts deposed by 12/16/2019. Disclosure of Defendant's experts 1/16/2020; Disclosure of Defendant's expert reports 2/12/2020; Defendant's experts deposed by 4/16/2020; Completion of all discovery 6/16/2020; Dispositive motions by 8/17/2020. Status hearing set for 5/15/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
February 14, 2018 Filing 54 STATUS Report Joint Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 Proposed Discovery Plan by Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc (Miller, Christopher)
February 6, 2018 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held on 2/8/2018. Defendants Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden M.D., John Trost, M.D., Kul Sood, M.D., and Arthur Funk M.D.'s motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) #47 is denied. Mailed notice. (etv, )
January 30, 2018 Filing 52 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Sherri Lynn, Michael Puisis(Shannon, Colleen)
January 30, 2018 Filing 51 ANSWER to amended complaint Defendant Wexford Health Sources, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Wexford Health Sources Inc(Miller, Christopher)
January 30, 2018 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM by Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #47 Corrected - Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) (Miller, Christopher)
January 30, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher M Miller for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #47 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/6/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Miller, Christopher)
January 30, 2018 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM by Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #47 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) (Miller, Christopher)
January 30, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) (Miller, Christopher)
January 9, 2018 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 1/9/2018. Defendants to Answer or otherwise plead by 1/30/2018. Rule 16 conference set for 2/15/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
January 8, 2018 Filing 45 AMENDED complaint by Carlos Jenkins, Carl Rogers, Harold Oliver, Michael Brent, Leander Carter, Nicholas Andrews, Blackie Veach, Delmar Gray, Brayonne Murff, Pascual Videgaray, Luis VIllavicencio-Se, Edward Harris, Oscar Patton, Willie Johnson, John Theis, Jason Ward, Dennis McArdle, Joe N Sherrod, Charles Kidd, Christopher Alexander, Stanley Miller against All Defendants (Muldoon, John)
January 3, 2018 Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc by Christopher M Miller (Miller, Christopher)
December 22, 2017 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sherri Lynn by Colleen Marie Shannon (Shannon, Colleen)
December 7, 2017 Filing 42 WITHDRAWING Megan Honingford as counsel for Defendant Michael Puisis and substituting Colleen Marie Shannon as counsel of record (Shannon, Colleen)
November 30, 2017 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 11/30/2017. Plaintiff has leave to amend complaint to name additional Plaintiffs if appropriate. Status hearing set for 1/9/2017 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
October 27, 2017 Filing 40 WITHDRAWING Harrison A. Cohen as counsel for Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc and substituting Jesse B Guth as counsel of record (Guth, Jesse)
October 18, 2017 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 10/18/2017. Status hearing set for 11/30/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
October 17, 2017 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc by Samuel Tallman (Tallman, Samuel)
October 17, 2017 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc by Jesse B Guth (Guth, Jesse)
September 6, 2017 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Michael Puisis by Megan Marie Honingford (Honingford, Megan)
August 23, 2017 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: On the court's own motion, status hearing set for 10/17/2017 is stricken and re-set to 10/18/2017 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
August 16, 2017 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Rule 16 conference set for 8/17/2017 is stricken. Status hearing set for 10/17/2017 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
August 15, 2017 Filing 33 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc (Tengesdal, Robert)
August 8, 2017 Filing 32 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/8/2017. Mailed notice. (etv, )
August 7, 2017 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Sherri Lynn, Michael Puisis, Louis Shicker. (kms)
August 2, 2017 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held on 8/2/2017. Motion for qualified protective order pursuant to HIPAA #23 is granted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
August 2, 2017 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by John Trost(Cohen, Harrison)
August 2, 2017 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kul Sood(Cohen, Harrison)
August 2, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Andrew Tilden(Cohen, Harrison)
August 2, 2017 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alfonso David(Cohen, Harrison)
August 2, 2017 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Funk Arthur(Cohen, Harrison)
August 1, 2017 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wexford Health Sources Inc by Samuel Tallman (Tallman, Samuel)
July 27, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Harrison A Cohen for presentment of motion for protective order #23 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/2/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Cohen, Harrison)
July 27, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost, Wexford Health Sources Inc for protective order (Cohen, Harrison)
July 13, 2017 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant Alfonso David, M.D., Andrew Tilden M.D., Arthur Funk, M.D., Kol Sood, M.D. and John Trost, M.D.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to file an Answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint #20 granted to and including 8/2/2017, without an appearance. Rule 16 conference set for 7/21/2017 is stricken and re-set to 8/17/2017 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
July 12, 2017 Filing 21 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Harrison A Cohen for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #20 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/20/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Cohen, Harrison)
July 12, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants Funk Arthur, Alfonso David, Kul Sood, Andrew Tilden, John Trost for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Cohen, Harrison)
July 12, 2017 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Funk Arthur by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
July 12, 2017 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kul Sood by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
July 12, 2017 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Trost by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
July 12, 2017 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Andrew Tilden by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
July 12, 2017 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alfonso David by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
July 12, 2017 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Funk Arthur by Harrison A Cohen (Cohen, Harrison)
July 12, 2017 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kul Sood by Harrison A Cohen (Cohen, Harrison)
July 12, 2017 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Trost by Harrison A Cohen (Cohen, Harrison)
July 12, 2017 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Andrew Tilden by Harrison A Cohen (Cohen, Harrison)
July 12, 2017 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alfonso David by Harrison A Cohen (Cohen, Harrison)
June 20, 2017 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 7/21/2017 stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 16. on 7/21/2017 at 9:30 AM. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 19, 2017 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wexford Health Sources Inc(Cohen, Harrison)
June 19, 2017 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wexford Health Sources Inc by Harrison A Cohen (Cohen, Harrison)
June 19, 2017 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wexford Health Sources Inc by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert)
May 15, 2017 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Minute entry of 5/15/2017, document #4, is amended to reflect that the initial status hearing will be held at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 7/21/2017 at 08:30 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, )
May 11, 2017 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Christopher Alexander, Nicholas Andrews, Michael Brent, Leander Carter, Delmar Gray, Edward Harris, Carlos Jenkins, Willie Johnson, Charles Kidd, Dennis McArdle, Stanley Miller, Brayonne Murff, Harold Oliver, Oscar Patton, Carl Rogers, Joe N Sherrod, John Theis, Luis VIllavicencio-Se, Blackie Veach, Pascual Videgaray, Jason Ward by John Joseph Muldoon, III (Muldoon, John)
May 11, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Muldoon, John)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Luis VIllavicencio-Se, Carlos Jenkins, Carl Rogers, Harold Oliver, Michael Brent, Leander Carter, Nicholas Andrews, Blackie Veach, Edward Harris, Oscar Patton, Willie Johnson, John Theis, Jason Ward, Delmar Gray, Dennis McArdle, Brayonne Murff, Joe N Sherrod, Charles Kidd, Pascual Videgaray, Christopher Alexander, Stanley Miller; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13165350.(Muldoon, John)
May 11, 2017 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (meg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brent, et al. vs. Wexford, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonso David
Represented By: Harrison A Cohen
Represented By: Jesse B Guth
Represented By: Samuel Tallman
Represented By: Christopher M Miller
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Tilden
Represented By: Harrison A Cohen
Represented By: Jesse B Guth
Represented By: Samuel Tallman
Represented By: Christopher M Miller
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Represented By: Harrison A Cohen
Represented By: Jesse B Guth
Represented By: Samuel Tallman
Represented By: Christopher M Miller
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Louis Shicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funk Arthur
Represented By: Harrison A Cohen
Represented By: Jesse B Guth
Represented By: Samuel Tallman
Represented By: Christopher M Miller
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Doctors (Jane/Joe 1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Lynn
Represented By: Colleen M Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Healthcare Unit Administrators (Jane/Joe Doe 16-20)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Kul Sood
Represented By: Harrison A Cohen
Represented By: Jesse B Guth
Represented By: Samuel Tallman
Represented By: Christopher M Miller
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wexford Employees (Jane/Joe Doe 21-25)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Puisis
Represented By: Colleen M Shannon
Represented By: Megan Honingford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Trost
Represented By: Harrison A Cohen
Represented By: Jesse B Guth
Represented By: Samuel Tallman
Represented By: Christopher M Miller
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Medical Directors (Jane/Joe 11-15)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe N Sherrod
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brent
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Theis
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Harris
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmar Gray
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kidd
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis McArdle
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Andrews
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Patton
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Alexander
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ward
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Oliver
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis VIllavicencio-Se
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Johnson
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Miller
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascual Videgaray
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Rogers
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Jenkins
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackie Veach
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leander Carter
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brayonne Murff
Represented By: John Joseph Muldoon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?