Gentlemen Gaming, LTD v. East Peoria, City of et al
Plaintiff: Gentlemen Gaming, LTD
Defendant: Ty Livingston, East Peoria, City of, East Peoria ZBA, Zoning Board of Appeals and City of East Peoria
Case Number: 1:2019cv01240
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gentlemen Gaming, LTD. Ty Livingston waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Zabek, Samuel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gentlemen Gaming, LTD. Zoning Board of Appeals waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Zabek, Samuel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gentlemen Gaming, LTD. City of East Peoria waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Zabek, Samuel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian M Funk on behalf of City of East Peoria, Ty Livingston, Zoning Board of Appeals (Funk, Brian)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jane M May on behalf of City of East Peoria, Ty Livingston, Zoning Board of Appeals (May, Jane)
July 15, 2019 Judge Joe Billy McDade and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley added. (FDS, ilcd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gentlemen Gaming, LTD. Internet Payment Receipt #0753-3148973 $400(FDS, ilcd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure (Zabek, Samuel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Samuel Benjamin Zabek on behalf of Gentlemen Gaming, LTD (Zabek, Samuel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Gentlemen Gaming, LTD. (Zabek, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentlemen Gaming, LTD v. East Peoria, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gentlemen Gaming, LTD
Represented By: Samuel Benjamin Zabek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Livingston
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Jane M May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Peoria, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Peoria ZBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Jane M May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of East Peoria
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Jane M May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?