Lais v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Valeri Susan Lais
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01264
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Valeri Susan Lais as to US ATTORNEY GENERAL 9/3/2019. (JS, ilcd)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Howard D Olinsky (Olinsky, Howard)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/5/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(FDS, ilcd)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/5/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915. The Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis was submitted under penalty of perjury and sufficiently demonstrates that the Plaintiff should be excused from paying the filing fee in this action. It is ordered that the Clerk issue summons, and the United States Marshal serve a copy of the Complaint, summons, and this Text Order upon the Defendant in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. (WG, ilcd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Valeri Susan Lais.(Olinsky, Howard)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Valeri Susan Lais. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiff SSN, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Letter to Clerk, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 USM-285 Forms, #9 USM-285 Forms, #10 USM-285 Forms)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lais v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeri Susan Lais
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-PEORIA SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?