Perley Cable Construction Inc. et al v. GregHart Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Perley Cable Construction Inc. and ProDesign Inc.
Defendant: GregHart Services LLC, Colette E Hartman, John L Gregory and Kirk A Gustafson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01285
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 44 JUDGMENT entered. (RK, ilcd)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ONLY: Plaintiffs' Motion #43 to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiffs' case is dismissed with prejudice and each party is to bear their own costs. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close the case. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/15/2019. (LR, ilcd)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Pursuant to the filing of the #43 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary the Rule 16 Conference set on 10/17/19 at 9:45 AM is VACATED. Entered on 10/15/19. (WG, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary by Plaintiffs Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. Responses due by 10/25/2019 (Heil, John)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Text ORDER vacating hearing. The parties have indicated they have reached a settlement and they expect to file a Notice of Dismissal within the next 7 to 10 days. Accordingly, the hearing scheduled for 10/7/2019 is vacated. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/4/2019. (CG, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Robert Ricks Tenney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tenney, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Decision on Motion to Dismiss by Defendant GregHart Services LLC. Responses due by 10/2/2019 (O'Neal, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 40 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Amended Verified Answer to Verified Complaint and Defenses Thereto by Defendant GregHart Services LLC. (O'Neal, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by GregHart Services LLC, John L Gregory, Kirk A Gustafson, Colette E Hartman. (O'Neal, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael D Gifford on behalf of All Defendants (Gifford, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's #31 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Complaint Exhibit. The Clerk is directed to replace Doc. 1-4 with Doc. 31-2. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 09/18/2019. (LR, ilcd)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/17/19 at 9:45 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 10/14/2019. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/18/2019. (WG, ilcd)
September 17, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint For Failure To State A Claim re #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by GregHart Services LLC. (O'Neal, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by Defendant GregHart Services LLC. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (O'Neal, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Verified Answer to Verified Complaint and Defenses Thereto by GregHart Services LLC.(O'Neal, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel by Emily Jane Perkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Perkins, Emily)
September 11, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel of Discovery Documents by Thomas W O'Neal on behalf of All Defendants (O'Neal, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #27 the Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery. The Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs' written discovery within 14 days of service and the Defendants are required to appear for depositions no later than 10/2/2019. Furthermore, the Plaintiffs must respond to Defendants' written discovery within 14 days of service and must present their agents and controlled forensic expert for depositions no later than 10/2/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/10/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Complaint Exhibit by Plaintiffs Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. Responses due by 9/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Heil, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Noah Allen Menold on behalf of GregHart Services LLC, John L Gregory, Kirk A Gustafson, Colette E Hartman (Menold, Noah) (Main Document 30 replaced on 9/9/2019) (SAG, ilcd).
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Defendants GregHart Services LLC, John L Gregory, Kirk A Gustafson, Colette E Hartman. (O'Neal, Thomas)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AGREED INTERIM ORDER re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/6/2019. SEE FULL AGREED INTERIM ORDER ATTACHED. (RK, ilcd)
September 5, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiffs Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. Responses due by 9/19/2019 (Perkins, Emily)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 10/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A in Peoria before Judge James E. Shadid. (CG, ilcd)
September 4, 2019 Filing 26 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL #25 AGREED INTERIM ORDER UNREDACTED (JRK, ilcd)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AGREED INTERIM ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 9/4/2019. The Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 is VACATED. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (JRK, ilcd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas W O'Neal on behalf of All Defendants (O'Neal, Thomas) (Main Document 24 replaced on 9/3/2019) (SAG, ilcd).
August 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer ddl of 9/17/2019 set for all Defendants. (RK, ilcd)
August 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Shadid: Parties present via phone by Atty J. Heil on behalf of the Plf and Attys M. Lied and T. Gronewald on behalf of the Dfts for Miscellaneous Hearing held on 8/30/2019. Discussion held regarding pending #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Court sets this matter for a Motion Hearing on 9/5/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A in Peoria before Judge James E. Shadid. (Court Reporter NM.) (RK, ilcd)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Kirk Gustafson served on 1 on 8/27/19, filed by Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (Heil, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Colette Hartman served on 1 on 8/26/19, filed by Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (Heil, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons John Gregory served on 1 on 8/26/19, filed by Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (Heil, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Greghart Services LLC served on 1 on 8/27/19, filed by Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (Heil, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by GregHart Services LLC. (Lied, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Timothy D Gronewold on behalf of All Defendants (Gronewold, Timothy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jeffrey G Sorenson on behalf of All Defendants (Sorenson, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael R Lied on behalf of All Defendants (Lied, Michael)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 8/30/2019 at 09:15 AM by telephone from Peoria (dial in information has been sent to the parties) before Judge James E. Shadid. (CG, ilcd)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Memorandum Exhibit Under Seal. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/27/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Complaint Exhibits Under Seal. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/27/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Heil, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit under Seal)(Heil, John)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Complaint Exhibits Under Seal #9 and Motion for Leave to File Memorandum Exhibit Under Seal #13 do not comply with Local Rule 5.10(A)(2) as Plaintiffs did not electronically file contemporaneously with those Motions the documents in question. The Plaintiffs must comply with Local Rule 5.10(A)(2) by end of day on 8/27/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/26/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiffs Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. Responses due by 9/6/2019 (Heil, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Heil, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. Responses due by 9/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Heil, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Emily Jane Perkins on behalf of Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc. (Perkins, Emily)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiffs Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. Responses due by 9/6/2019 (Heil, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to GregHart Services LLC, John L Gregory, Kirk A Gustafson, and Colette E Hartman. (JRK, ilcd)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Corporate Disclosure Statement re #1 Complaint, (Heil, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS as to Kirk A. Gustafson by Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (JRK, ilcd)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, (Heil, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS as to John L. Gregory by Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (Heil, John) Modified on 8/23/2019 to correct title of filing (JRK, ilcd).
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS as to Greghart Services, LLC by Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (Heil, John) Modified on 8/23/2019 to correct title of filing (JRK, ilcd).
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS as to Colette E. Harman by Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (Heil, John) Modified on 8/23/2019 to correct title of filing (JRK, ilcd).
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GregHart Services LLC, John L Gregory, Kirk A Gustafson, Colette E Hartman ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3179359.), filed by Perley Cable Construction Inc., ProDesign Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Heil, John) (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/19/2019) (RK, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perley Cable Construction Inc. et al v. GregHart Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GregHart Services LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey G Sorenson
Represented By: Michael R Lied
Represented By: Michael D Gifford
Represented By: Timothy D Gronewold
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Represented By: Thomas W O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colette E Hartman
Represented By: Jeffrey G Sorenson
Represented By: Michael R Lied
Represented By: Michael D Gifford
Represented By: Timothy D Gronewold
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Represented By: Thomas W O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Gregory
Represented By: Jeffrey G Sorenson
Represented By: Michael R Lied
Represented By: Michael D Gifford
Represented By: Timothy D Gronewold
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Represented By: Thomas W O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk A Gustafson
Represented By: Jeffrey G Sorenson
Represented By: Michael R Lied
Represented By: Michael D Gifford
Represented By: Timothy D Gronewold
Represented By: Noah Allen Menold
Represented By: Thomas W O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perley Cable Construction Inc.
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Represented By: Emily Jane Perkins
Represented By: Robert Ricks Tenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProDesign Inc.
Represented By: John P Heil, Jr
Represented By: Emily Jane Perkins
Represented By: Robert Ricks Tenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?