Thurman v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Karen Thurman
Defendant: C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01309
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Eric I Long
3 Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/22/19. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #11 and the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is RESCHEDULED to 12/9/19 at 9:45 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (SKR, ilcd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ostfeld, Gregory)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/10/19. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (SKR, ilcd)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO Judge Colin Bruce and Magistrate Judge Eric Long entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/8/19: This case is related to other cases already pending in the district, and transferred to Judge Colin Bruce for further handling. Judge Michael M. Mihm, Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley no longer assigned to case. (TK, ilcd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated as counsel in this matter as Attorney Gregory Ostfeld has entered his appeaerance. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/25/19. (WG, ilcd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ostfeld, Gregory)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Richard North Jr. to be replaced by Gregory E. ostfeld and Lori G. Cohen, by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. Responses due by 10/8/2019 (Ostfeld, Gregory)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Thomas Baier on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Baier, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gregory E Ostfeld on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Ostfeld, Gregory)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02902. .
September 6, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Central District of Illinois via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-02902-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16880451 filed by Karen Thurman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurman v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Thurman
Represented By: Robert J Binstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory E Ostfeld
Represented By: Michael Thomas Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory E Ostfeld
Represented By: Michael Thomas Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?