Sims v. Clark
Petitioner: Johnnie Lee Sims
Respondent: Daniel Clark
Case Number: 1:2019cv01313
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (JS, ilcd)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 9/24/2019. Petitioner's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because the relief he seeks cannot be provided under that section. Petitioner's motions in this case (Docs. #2 , #4 , and #5 ) areDENIED AS MOOT. Attorney Greggory Walters's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel(Doc. #6 ) is GRANTED for posterity of the record. This matter is CLOSED. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER & OPINION.(JS, ilcd)
September 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Non-Interest and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Walters, Greggory)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Petitioner Johnnie Lee Sims. Responses due by 10/3/2019 (JS, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Petitioner Johnnie Lee Sims. Responses due by 10/3/2019 (JS, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Johnnie Lee Sims. (JS, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Johnnie Lee Sims. Responses due by 10/3/2019 (JS, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Johnnie Lee Sims. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(JS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Clark
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnnie Lee Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?