Cunningham v. Entzel, Warden
Petitioner: Teovonni Cunningham
Respondent: Frederick Entzel, Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv01320
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Petitioner Teovonni Cunningham. (RL, ilcd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONDENT'S SUR-REPLY filed by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. (RL, ilcd)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 11/12/2019: Respondent has filed a Motion to file a Sur-Reply (d/e #7 ). Respondent seeks to file a sur-reply to respond to an argument Petitioner raised for the first time in his reply. Respondents Motion (d/e #7 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to docket Respondents Sur-Reply (d/e [7-1]) attached to Respondents Motion.(RL, ilcd)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. Responses due by 11/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Walters, Greggory)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Reply Motion under 28 USC 2241 filed by Petitioner Teovonni Cunningham. (ED, ilcd)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/18/2019: Respondent's Motion #4 to Seal presentence report materials is GRANTED. The presentence report materials at docket entry #5 , shall remain sealed. These materials also appear to have inadvertently been placed on the public record under docket entry [4-1]. The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal docket entry [4-1] as well. (RL, ilcd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Walters, Greggory)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appendix (UNDER SEAL) to Response)(Walters, Greggory)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Publicly Filed) to Response)(Walters, Greggory)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/16/2019: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall serve upon Respondent, or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon its attorney, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Petitioner shall include with the original paper to be filed with the Clerk of the Court a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of any document was mailed to Respondent or its counsel. Any paper received by this Court that has not been filed with the Clerk or that fails to include a certificate of service will be disregarded by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner immediately notify the Court of any change in his mailing address. Failure to notify the Court of any change in mailing address will result indismissal of this lawsuit, with prejudice. (RL, ilcd)
October 15, 2019 Receipt#44626003670 for $5.00 for Filing Fee. (RL, ilcd)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/04/2019: : Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before November 4, 2019, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(RL, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Teovonni Cunningham.(RL, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Entzel, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frederick Entzel, Warden
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teovonni Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?