Westlund v. Entzel
Petitioner: Beau Anthony Westlund
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Case Number: 1:2019cv01321
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/22/2019. (RK, ilcd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Respondent Frederick Entzel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Walters, Greggory)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/18/2019. Respondent is directed to respond to Petitioner's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (Doc. 5) within 14 days of the date of this Order. (JR, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(c) by Petitioner Beau Anthony Westlund. Responses due by 12/2/2019 (RK, ilcd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT entered. (RK, ilcd)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER & OPINION Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/15/2019. IT IS ORDERED: Petitioner's Petition (Doc. #1 ) is DENIED and this matter is TERMINATED. If Petitioner wishes to appeal, he must do so in the manner and time set out in the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER & OPINION. (JRK, ilcd)
October 4, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626035384 (VH, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiencies to be remedied by 10/30/2019. (RK, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/2/2019. The Court notes Petitioner has neither paid the applicable $5.00 filing fee nor submitted a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will postpone its requisite Rule 4 assessment of this Petition until Petitioner has either paid the filing fee or filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Petitioner does not either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Text Order, his Petition will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (JR, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Beau Anthony Westlund. (RK, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Beau Anthony Westlund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Transcript, #3 Cont'd transcript)(RK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westlund v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Beau Anthony Westlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?