United States of America v. Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc.
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01323
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/10/2020 at 9:45 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 1/7/2020. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/27/2019. (WG, ilcd)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Reply by United States of America re #7 Answer to Complaint .. (Applegate, Daniel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc. (Cox, Arthur)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc..(Cox, Arthur)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Arthur Christopher Cox on behalf of Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc. (Cox, Arthur)
November 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc. answer due 11/26/2019. (JS, ilcd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for docket nos. 1, 2, and 4 and attachments served on Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc. on 11/12/2019, filed by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit re #1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - IRS Summons)(Applegate, Daniel)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE UNREDACTED (VH, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 10/29/2019. See full written Order.(VH, ilcd)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition to Enforce IRS Summons) against Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of IRS Revenue Agent Tammy Robison, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Applegate, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel A Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pinnacle Actuarial Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Christopher Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?