Smith v. Kennedy et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Smith
Defendant: Teri Kennedy, . Brown, . Miester, Chad Brown and Randall Meister
Case Number: 1:2019cv01328
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jimmy Smith. Brown waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020; Teri Kennedy waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020; Miester waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (RL, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Azariah V Jelks on behalf of. Brown, Teri Kennedy,. Miester (Jelks, Azariah)
November 20, 2019 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 11/20/19, in the amount of $ 8.60; receipt number 14626035724 (FDS, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Teri Kennedy,. Miester,. Brown on 11/18/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/18/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/18/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for inhumane conditions of confinement against the named defendants. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd)
November 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held 11/12/19 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by Plaintiff Jimmy Smith. Merit Review Hearing held by telephone. Allegations of the Complaint discussed. Written order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C1:41 PM.) (TC, ilcd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/12/2019 1:41:54 PM ]. File Size [ 1257 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:37 ]. (admin).
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 TELEPHONE WRIT issued to Pontiac CC for hearing 11/12/19 at 1:40 p.m. (SAG, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/28/2019. A merit review hearing is set for 11/12/2019 at 1:40 p.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing.(SAG, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $8.60. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/11/2019. (SAG, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jimmy Smith (SAG, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Jimmy Smith.(SAG, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jimmy Smith.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Kennedy
Represented By: Azariah V Jelks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Miester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Brown
Represented By: Azariah V Jelks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Meister
Represented By: Azariah V Jelks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?