Perdue et al v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dustin Murray, Noreen Perdue, Elizabeth Davis-Berg, Harley Williams, Melanie Savoie, Cheryl Ellingson, Mary Willliams and Angela Trang
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01330
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) and Creation of a Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/11/2019. (KZ, ilcd)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #14 MOTION to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN F. JOHNS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL by Elizabeth Davis-Berg, Cheryl Ellingson, Dustin Murray, Noreen Perdue, Melanie Savoie, Angela Trang, Harley Williams, Mary Willliams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shamberg, Kyle)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #14 MOTION to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel by Elizabeth Davis-Berg, Cheryl Ellingson, Dustin Murray, Noreen Perdue, Melanie Savoie, Angela Trang, Harley Williams, Mary Willliams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shamberg, Kyle)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Davis-Berg, Cheryl Ellingson, Dustin Murray, Noreen Perdue, Melanie Savoie, Angela Trang, Harley Williams, Mary Willliams. Responses due by 12/24/2019 (Shamberg, Kyle)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elizabeth Davis-Berg, Cheryl Ellingson, Dustin Murray, Noreen Perdue, Melanie Savoie, Angela Trang, Harley Williams, Mary Willliams re #11 Notice of Appearance of Attorney Andrew W. Ferich (Ferich, Andrew)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elizabeth Davis-Berg, Cheryl Ellingson, Dustin Murray, Noreen Perdue, Melanie Savoie, Angela Trang, Harley Williams, Mary Willliams re #10 Notice of Appearance of Attorney Benjamin F. Johns (Johns, Benjamin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew W Ferich on behalf of Elizabeth Davis-Berg, Cheryl Ellingson, Dustin Murray, Noreen Perdue, Melanie Savoie, Angela Trang, Harley Williams, Mary Willliams (Ferich, Andrew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Benjamin F Johns on behalf of Elizabeth Davis-Berg, Cheryl Ellingson, Dustin Murray, Noreen Perdue, Melanie Savoie, Angela Trang, Harley Williams, Mary Willliams (Johns, Benjamin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing of "Plaintiff Gordon Grewing's Motion to Consolidate and Transfer Actions to the District of Kansas Under 28 U.S.C. 1407," before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(TK, ilcd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Hy-Vee, Inc., filed by Noreen Perdue, Dustin Murray.(Shamberg, Kyle)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Court adopts the schedule set forth in the parties #5 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2019. Responsive pleading due by 1/6/20. Motion directed at the first amended complaint to be filed by 2/5/20 and responses to that motion due by 2/20/20. Entered on 10/31/19. (WG, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Maria Ann Boelen on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc. (Boelen, Maria)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule by Hy-Vee, Inc... (Boelen, Maria)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Boelen, Maria)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noreen Perdue, Dustin Murray. Hy-Vee, Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Shamberg, Kyle)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hy-Vee, Inc and returned to Atty Shamburg for service. (JRK, ilcd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against Hy-Vee, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3218789.), filed by Noreen Perdue, Dustin Murray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shamberg, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perdue et al v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Murray
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreen Perdue
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Davis-Berg
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Williams
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Savoie
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ellingson
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Willliams
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Trang
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Ann Boelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?