Rush v. Leininger et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Rush
Defendant: . Henkel, . Torres, John Doe #1, . Henson, . Leininger, Nicky .., . Farley, . Biros, . Dame, . Bertville, . McBride, . Whitecotton, Todd Nelson, John Doe #3, . Pufall, John Doe #2, . Newkirk, Terri Kennedy and Sherry Powers
Case Number: 1:2019cv01365
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to. Leininger,. Biros,. Farley,. Dame,. Bertville,. Henson,. Henkel,. Pufall,. Newkirk,. McBride, Sherry Powers, Todd Nelson, Nicky.. on 1/9/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 1/9/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 1/9/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO: 1) Dismiss Defendants Kennedy, Torres, and Whitecotton for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to by 28 U.S.C. 1915A; 2) Deny Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief, #6 ; 3) Deny Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel with leave to renew, #5 ; 4) Attempt service on Defendants pursuant to the standard procedures; 5) Set an internal court deadline 60 days from the entry of this order for the court to check on the status of service and enter scheduling deadlines; and 6) Enter the Court's standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd)
November 22, 2019 Filing fee received: $400, receipt number 14626035747 (JRK, ilcd)
November 15, 2019 Set Deadline: Prisoner Prepayment due by 11/29/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 11/15/2019. Plaintiff, a pro se prisoner, has filed a complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, a motion to proceed IFP, a motion for appointment of counsel, and a motion for emergency injunctive relief. #1 , #3 , #5 , #6 . Plaintiff's complaint alleges several claims stemming from an incident on July 1, 2019. #1 . Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction asks for an order prohibiting IDOC officials from handcuffing Plaintiff with his hands behind his back for long periods of time #6 . The Court notes the only incident alleged involving the use of handcuffs was four months ago on July 1, 2019. The Court also notes although Plaintiff has filed a motion to proceed IFP, he currently has $1,175.82 in his Trust Fund Account. Therefore, the motion to proceed IFP is denied #3 . Before his case can proceed, Plaintiff must pay the full $400 filing fee within 14 days or on or before December 1, 2019. If Plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee by the deadline, his case will be dismissed without prejudice. (SAG, ilcd)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Dennis Rush. Responses due by 11/27/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Dennis Rush. Responses due by 11/27/2019 (SAG, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Dennis Rush (SAG, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Dennis Rush.(SAG, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dennis Rush. (Attachments: #1 Index)(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Leininger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Leininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicky ..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Biros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Dame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Bertville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Whitecotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Pufall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?