Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund v. The Red Ants Boring Company
Plaintiff: Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: The Red Ants Boring Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01372
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/24/20 at 9:45 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 1/21/2020. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 12/16/2019. (WG, ilcd)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by The Red Ants Boring Company.(Miller, Todd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Megan Marie Moore on behalf of All Defendants (Moore, Megan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Todd A Miller on behalf of All Defendants (Miller, Todd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund. The Red Ants Boring Company served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Stuckel, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Red Ants Boring Company. (VH, ilcd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Red Ants Boring Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3246335.), filed by Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Stuckel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund v. The Red Ants Boring Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: David W Stuckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Red Ants Boring Company
Represented By: Megan Marie Moore
Represented By: Todd A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?