Republic Technologies (NA) LLC et al v. Discount Smoke and Pop Plus Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sream Inc, REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC and Republic Technologies (NA) LLC
Defendant: KHALIL OTAYFAH, DISCOUNT SMOKE AND POP PLUS INC. and Discount Smoke and Pop Plus Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01393
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Eric I Long
3 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Republic Technologies (NA) LLC, Sream Inc. Khalil Otayfah waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Langone, Christopher)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Republic Technologies (NA) LLC, Sream Inc. Discount Smoke and Pop Plus Inc waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Langone, Christopher)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jonathan LA Phillips on behalf of Discount Smoke and Pop Plus Inc, Khalil Otayfah (Phillips, Jonathan)
December 18, 2019 Filing fee paid: $400, receipt number 24626009177. (TC, ilcd)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/16/2019. Plaintiff filed this Complaint on 11/26/19, but failed to pay the $400 filing fee. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee on or before 12/30/19, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. (Miscellaneous Deadline 12/30/2019)(DS, ilcd)
December 12, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley no longer assigned to the case. (DS, ilcd)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/12/2019. This matter is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley is no longer assigned to this case. (DS, ilcd)
December 10, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Judge James E. Shadid no longer assigned to the case. (JS, ilcd)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/10/2019. This action is a trademark action that shares common questions of law and fact with cases 19-2322, 19-2323, 19-2327, and 19-2344, all of which are pending before District Judge Bruce. Case 19-2322 was the earliest filed case. Pursuant to Local Rule 42.1, this action is deemed related to 19-2322 and is therefore transferred to District Judge Bruce for further proceedings.(JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC.(JS, ilcd)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC, Sream Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA) LLC et al v. Discount Smoke and Pop Plus Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHALIL OTAYFAH
Represented By: Jonathan LA Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISCOUNT SMOKE AND POP PLUS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Smoke and Pop Plus Inc
Represented By: Jonathan LA Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream Inc
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA) LLC
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?