Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Excessive Colors Inc. d/b/a Vaporized Tobacco Accessries et al
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc, Sream Inc and Republic Technologies (NA) LLC
Defendant: EXCESSIVE COLORS INC. d/b/a VAPORIZED TOBACCO ACCESSORIES, RAGHED RUSTOM and Excessive Colors Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01394
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Eric I Long
3 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Excessive Colors Inc and Raghed Rustom (original Summonses returned to plaintiff's counsel for service). (KM, ilcd)
December 18, 2019 Filing fee paid: $400, receipt number 24626009177. (TC, ilcd)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/16/2019. Plaintiff filed this Complaint on 11/26/19, but failed to pay the $400 filing fee. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee on or before 12/30/19, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. (Miscellaneous Deadline 12/30/2019)(DS, ilcd)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/12/2019. This matter is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley is no longer assigned to this case. (JMB, ilcd)
December 10, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Judge James E. Shadid no longer assigned to the case. (JS, ilcd)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/10/2019. This action is a trademark action that shares common questions of law and fact with cases 19-2322, 19-2323, 19-2327, and 19-2344, all of which are pending before District Judge Bruce. Case 19-2322 was the earliest filed case. Pursuant to Local Rule 42.1, this action is deemed related to 19-2322 and is therefore transferred to District Judge Bruce for further proceedings.(JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC.(JS, ilcd)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Excessive Colors Inc. d/b/a Vaporized Tobacco Accessries et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXCESSIVE COLORS INC. d/b/a VAPORIZED TOBACCO ACCESSORIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAGHED RUSTOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excessive Colors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream Inc
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA) LLC
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?