Hicks v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Roy Hicks
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01019
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/17/2020 at 9:30 AM via telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 4/14/2020. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/26/2020. (WG, ilcd)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/25/2020 denying #7 Motion to Remand. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JRK, ilcd)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Strike entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/11/2020. Document #10 is stricken as improvidently filed. (JR, ilcd) Modified on 2/12/2020 to correct spelling (VH, ilcd).
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ford Motor Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34)(Boyle, Mark)
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Supplement #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Boyle, Mark)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED ON 2/11/2020: MOTION to Supplement #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34)(Boyle, Mark) Modified on 2/11/2020 (JRK, ilcd).
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Edward E Fu on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Fu, Edward)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Boyle, Mark)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Roy Hicks. Responses due by 2/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Corwin, Lisa)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa Rae Corwin on behalf of Roy Hicks (Corwin, Lisa)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas W Cushing on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Cushing, Thomas)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER STRIKING/VACATING DOCUMENT entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/17/2020: Defense counsel's 1/15/2020 filing #3 bears the electronic signature of one attorney but was filed under the CM/ECF login of another. This is prohibited. Counsel is directed to review and comply with Local Rule 11.4. Further, the filing should be made using the correct CMECF event under Notice of Appearance of Counsel. (JRK, ilcd)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing and Supplemental Exhibit 1 and 2 by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Boyle, Mark)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 STRICKEN/VACATED PURSUANT TO TEXT ORDER ENTERED 1/17/2020: CERTIFICATE Appearance of Counsel - T. Cushing. (Boyle, Mark) Modified on 1/17/2020 (JRK, ilcd).
January 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2020. (JRK, ilcd)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: It appears Exhibit A [1-2] attached to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Removal #1 is missing portions, as the entirety of the underlying state court Complaint and summons referenced in the Notice are not included. Defendant Ford must file those documents by 1/17/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/13/2020. (KZ, ilcd)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark Boyle on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Boyle, Mark)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3279078), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Boyle, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Mark Boyle
Represented By: Edward E Fu
Represented By: Thomas W Cushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Hicks
Represented By: Lisa Rae Corwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?