Jackson v. Lawrence
Petitioner: Jason L Jackson
Respondent: Frank Lawrence and Alex Jones
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2020cv01081
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: GRANTING Respondent's #5 Motion for Extension of Time and request to substitute party under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), and FINDING MOOT Petitioner's #4 Motion to Substitute Party. On April 20, 2020, Respondent filed the aforementioned Motion requesting an additional 60 days to file his response, as there have been unforeseeable delays in light of the recent coronavirus crisis. Respondent also asks the Court to substitute parties, as Frank Lawrence is no longer the Warden at Menard Correctional Center. Petitioner filed his Motion on April 17, 2020, also requesting that the Court substitute Alex Jones for Frank Lawrence. Respondent's Motion is GRANTED, and he has up to and including June 26, 2020, to file his response. Petitioner's Motion is FOUND MOOT, as Petitioner's request is identical, in part, to Respondent's. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute Alex Jones for Respondent Frank Lawrence. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm. (JA, ilcd)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) by Respondent Frank Lawrence. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Elsner, Evan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Party by Petitioner Jason L Jackson. Responses due by 5/1/2020 (RK, ilcd)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Evan Blake Elsner on behalf of Frank Lawrence (Elsner, Evan)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION AND ORDER ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 4/6/2020. The Court's preliminary review indicates that the Petition could have merit and orders Respondent to show cause, if any it may have, within twenty-one (21) days after service of this Order, why said Writ should not be granted. See full Opinion and Order attached.(RK, ilcd)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC Section 2254 (Filing fee $ 5.00 14626036420), filed by Jason L Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cont'd, #2 Exhibit cont'd, #3 Exhibit cont'd, #4 envelope)(RK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frank Lawrence
Represented By: Evan Blake Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alex Jones
Represented By: Evan Blake Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?