Edwards v. Generations at Riverview, LLC
Plaintiff: Beth Edwards
Defendant: Generations at Riverview, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01086
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Cyle Reginald Catlett on behalf of Generations at Riverview, LLC (Catlett, Cyle)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Thomas Charron, Jr on behalf of Generations at Riverview, LLC (Charron, Joseph)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Generations at Riverview, LLC answer due 5/14/2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 4/1/20. (WG, ilcd)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Generations at Riverview, LLC. Responses due by 4/14/2020 (Charron, Joseph)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Thomas Charron, Jr on behalf of Generations at Riverview, LLC (Charron, Joseph)
March 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Generations at Riverview, LLC answer due 4/2/2020. (RK, ilcd)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Beth Edwards. (Atkins, William)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Generations at Riverview, LLC. (RK, ilcd)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Generations at Riverview, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3320602.), filed by Beth Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atkins, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Generations at Riverview, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generations at Riverview, LLC
Represented By: Cyle Reginald Catlett
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Charron, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Edwards
Represented By: William W P Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?