Mclean et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samantha McLean and Ricky Mclean
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv01096
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak filed by Defendant American Medical Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum) (TK, ilcd). Modified by Clerk's office on 5/7/2020 to add exhibit A from #96 (TK, ilcd).
May 7, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak by Defendant American Medical Systems Inc. Responses due by 5/21/2020 (Murphy, Christopher) Modified on 5/7/2020 by Clerk's office to remove exh A and add it to #97 (TK, ilcd).
April 24, 2020 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Objection to Notice of Related Cases MOTION for Reconsideration re #92 Objection, Order,,,,, maintaining separate cases ; to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Notice of Related Cases #94 filed by Plaintiffs Samantha McLean, Ricky Mclean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service)(Waisbren, Elise)
April 22, 2020 Filing 94 Response by American Medical Systems Inc. to Plaintiff's #92 Objection to Defendant's Notice of Related Cases. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(RK, ilcd)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #93 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk is directed to file Document 93-1 as a separate docket entry and attach Documents 93-2, 93-3, and 93-4 as exhibits to the new docket entry. Plaintiff has until 5/6/2020 to file a reply. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 04/22/2020. (LR, ilcd)
April 18, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Objection to Notice of Related Cases, MOTION for Reconsideration re #92 Objection, Order,,,,, maintaining separate cases by Defendant American Medical Systems Inc. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Response to Objection, #2 Exhibit A (Exhibit A to Response to Objection), #3 Exhibit B (Exhibit B to Response to Objection), #4 Exhibit C (Exhibit C to Response to Objection))(Murphy, Christopher)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 4/17/2020. Defendant filed a #91 Notice of Related Cases pursuant to Local Rule 42.1. Defendant identifies Hines v. American Medical Systems, Inc., Case No. 2:20-cv-2035, as a similar case from the same MDL that was recently remanded to the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division. Plaintiffs filed a #92 Response and Objection, disagreeing that a consolidation or transfer is appropriate. Plaintiffs argue judicial efficiency will not be advanced by consolidating or transferring these cases to be before the same trial court. The Court agrees. Both cases are brought against the same Defendant for injuries from synthetic pelvic mesh products and they have received the benefit of coordinated proceedings under the MDL; however, these cases involve different products that are used to treat different medical conditions. As these cases now prepare for trial, the Court does not believe there would be a substantial saving of judicial resources by assigning these two cases to a single district court judge. When Judge Goodwin, who oversaw the MDL, ordered this case to be transferred, he stated: For the convenience of the parties and in order to promote the final resolution of these cases, it appears to the court that the cases would be more expeditiously concluded in the venues from which they arise. For these reasons, these cases will not be consolidated or transferred to be before the same trial court.(RK, ilcd)
April 16, 2020 Filing 92 OBJECTION to #91 Notice (Other) by Samantha McLean, Ricky Mclean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(Waisbren, Elise)
April 15, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Murphy, Christopher)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 4/15/2020. The Court conducted a phone conference with the parties on 4/13/2020 for the purpose of reviewing the status of the case. The plaintiff's informed the Court of difficulties obtaining certain discovery from the Plaintiff's leadership team in the MDL and asked the Court to inquire with Judge Goodwin who oversaw the MDL case. It is reported, at least for now, that the information requested by the plaintiff's counsel is and has been available to them in the following ways: (1) access to Crivella, the document repository that houses the documents that have been produced in this litigation by AMS; (2) access to a Drop Box that contains a significant amount of work product and leadership analysis of the AMS liability case; and (3) as to all filings in the MDL (orders, motions, responses, replies, transcripts of hearings, etc.), on the court's website at www.wvsd.uscourts.gov and/or through a Pacer Account for the MDL. Individual plaintiffs were responsible for their own specific causation discovery. The Court requests the plaintiff's conduct another review as set out above and if the information provided above does not satisfy them, then Judge Goodwin has indicated a willingness to participate in a telephone conference with plaintiffs, the leadership team, and defense counsel to resolve the issues.(RK, ilcd)
April 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Shadid: Parties present via telephone Attys Elise Waisbren and Stephen Phillips on behalf of the Plaintiffs and Attys Chris Murphy and Stephen McConnell on behalf of the Defendants for a Status Conference on Monday, 4/13/2020. Court reviews the history of the case as well as the current status. Pursuant to LR 42.1, Defense counsel indicates there is a related case filed in this district; case no. 20-2035-CSB-EIL. Court directs counsel to file written notice. Parties to regroup for another Status Conference on Tuesday, 5/12/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Judge James E. Shadid. Dial-in information will be provided to counsel. (Court Reporter NM) (JRK, ilcd)
April 10, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher R Murphy on behalf of American Medical Systems Inc (Murphy, Christopher) (Main Document 90 replaced on 4/13/2020) (TK, ilcd).
March 27, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference to discuss pending motions and set a schedule is set for 4/13/2020 at 10:00AM by telephone from Peoria (court has sent conference call information to the parties) before Judge James E. Shadid. (CG, ilcd)
March 13, 2020 Filing 88 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-10892. .
March 9, 2020 Filing 87 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02325 - American Medical Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement ECF 1229 - PTO 169, #2 Supplement ECF 288 - PTO 17, #3 Supplement ECF 748 - PTO 73, #4 Supplement ECF 1234 - PTO 171, #5 Supplement ECF 6725 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Garely, Blaivas, Galloway, #6 Supplement ECF 6726 - AMS Memo ISO Daubert re Garely, Blaivas, Galloway, #7 Supplement ECF 6787 - P's Response to Daubert re Galloway, #8 Supplement ECF 6709 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Guelcher, Mays, #9 Supplement ECF 6710 - AMS Memo ISO Daubert re Guelcher, Mays, #10 Supplement ECF 6790 - P's Opposition re Daubert Guelcher, Mays Part 1 of 2, #11 Supplement ECF 6790 - P's Opposition re Daubert Guelcher, Mays Part 2 of 2, #12 Supplement ECF 6868 - AMS Reply to P's Opp re Guelcher, #13 Supplement ECF 6719 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #14 Supplement ECF 6720 - AMS Brief ISO Daubert re Rosenzweig, #15 Supplement ECF 6836 - P's Opposition to Daubert re Rosenzweig, #16 Supplement ECF 6876 - AMS Reply ISO Daubert re Rosenzweig, #17 Supplement ECF 7465 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Garely, #18 Supplement ECF 7466 - AMS Brief ISO Daubert re Garely, #19 Supplement ECF 7498 - P's Adoption of Response to Daubert re Garely, #20 Supplement ECF 7508 - AMS Reply ISO Daubert re Garely, #21 Supplement ECF 7471 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Iakovlev Part 1 of 4, #22 Supplement ECF 7471 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Iakovlev Part 2 of 4, #23 Supplement ECF 7471 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Iakovlev Part 3 of 4, #24 Supplement ECF 7471 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Iakovlev Part 4 of 4, #25 Supplement ECF 7473 - AMS Brief ISO Daubert re Iakovlev, #26 Supplement ECF 7491 - P's Adoption of Response to Daubert re Iakovlev, #27 Supplement ECF 7507 - AMS Reply ISO Daubert re Iakovlev, #28 Supplement ECF 7481 - P's Adoption of Daubert re Badylak, Becker, Kozak, Coad, #29 Supplement ECF 7400 - P's Daubert Motion to Exclude Kozak, #30 Supplement ECF 7401 - P's Brief ISO Daubert re Kozak, #31 Supplement ECF 7495 - AMS Adoption of Response to Daubert re Kozak, #32 Supplement ECF 83 - P's Daubert Motion to Exclude Becker, #33 Supplement ECF 84 - P's Memo ISO Daubert re Becker, #34 Supplement ECF 134 - AMS Opposition to P's Daubert re Becker, #35 Supplement ECF 7494 - AMS Opposition to P's Adoption of Daubert re Becker, #36 Supplement ECF 143 - P's Memo ISO Daubert re Becker, #37 Supplement ECF 96 - P's Daubert Motion to Exclude Badylak, #38 Supplement ECF 97 - P's Memo ISO Daubert re Badylak, #39 Supplement ECF 135 - AMS Opposition to Daubert re Badylak Part 1 of 3, #40 Supplement ECF 135 - AMS Opposition to Daubert re Badylak Part 2 of 3, #41 Supplement ECF 135 - AMS Opposition to Daubert re Badylak Part 3 of 3, #42 Supplement ECF 7496 - AMS Opposition to Adoption of Daubert re Badylak Part 1 of 3, #43 Supplement ECF 7496 - AMS Opposition to Adoption of Daubert re Badylak Part 2 of 3, #44 Supplement ECF 7496 - AMS Opposition to Adoption of Daubert re Badylak Part 3 of 3, #45 Supplement ECF 166 - P's Reply ISO Daubert re Badylak, #46 Supplement ECF 7497 - P's Adoption of Daubert Motion to Exclude Coad, #47 Supplement ECF 289 - Master Long Form Complaint and Jury Demand, #48 Supplement ECF 290 - Short Form Complaint, #49 Supplement ECF 291 - Amended Short Form Complaint, #50 Supplement ECF 292 - AMS Answer and Defense to P's 1st Amended MLFC, #51 Supplement ECF 7475 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #52 Supplement ECF 7478 - AMS Brief ISO Daubert re Rosenzweig, #53 Supplement ECF 7411 - P's Memo In Opp of Daubert re Rosezweig, #54 Supplement ECF 7501 - P's Adoption of Response to Daubert re Rosenzweig, #55 Supplement ECF 7512 - AMS Reply to Opp of Daubert re Rosenzweig, #56 Supplement ECF 7532 - P's Adoption of Daubert to Exclude Badylak, #57 Supplement ECF 7467 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Blaivas, #58 Supplement ECF 7468 - AMS Brief ISO Daubert re Blaivas, #59 Supplement ECF 7492 - P's Adoption of Response re Blaivas, #60 Supplement ECF 6789 - P's Memo ISO Opp to Daubert re Garely, Blaivas, Galloway, #61 Supplement ECF 7509 - AMS Reply to Opp to Daubert Blaivas, #62 Supplement ECF 7477 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Mays, #63 Supplement ECF 7480 - AMS Brief ISO Daubert re Mays, #64 Supplement ECF 7469 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Guelcher, #65 Supplement ECF 7470 - AMS Brief ISO Daubert re Guelcher, #66 Supplement ECF 7410 - P's Opposition to Daubert re Mays, #67 Supplement ECF 7414 - P's Response to Daubert re Guelcher Part 1 of 2, #68 Supplement ECF 7414 - P's Response to Daubert re Guelcher Part 2 of 2, #69 Supplement ECF 7500 - P's Adoption of Response to Daubert re Guelcher, #70 Supplement ECF 7505 - AMS Reply to P's Adoption of Response re Guelcher)(Binis, Barbara)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER The #17 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Withdraw #16 Notice of Deposition is GRANTED and the Notice of Deposition of Jason Lowe, M.D. is STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/25/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying #73 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/25/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 03/10/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 03/09/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/25/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER directing the Clerk to replace ECF No. 56-1 (Exhibit A and Exhibit C (Parts 1 and 2) only)), in this civil action with exhibits 7559-1, 7559-2, and 7559-3 filed in AMS 2325. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
January 24, 2020 Filing 82 BRIEF by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #56 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (kew)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER directing the Clerk to file the Memoranda of Law listed herein in each individual case and link it to the appropriate Daubert motions. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on 04/16/2019, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/24/2019. Redaction Request due 6/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2019. (css)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying #72 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order to Enforce Prior Agreements Regarding Defense Case-Specific Expert Eric Rovner, M.D. and MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Strike Dr. Rovner's General Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/17/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
April 16, 2019 Filing 78 TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/16/2019 re: #72 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order to Enforce Prior Agreements Regarding Defense Case-Specific Expert Eric Rovner, M.D.MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Strike Dr. Rovner's General Expert Report, Court Reporter: Cathy Schutte-Stant. (hkl)
April 8, 2019 Filing 77 REPLY by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to #74 Memorandum In Opposition (Waisbren, Elise) (Modified on 4/8/2019 to remove link to #73) (slr).
April 3, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to #75 Brief In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G (Redacted))(Waisbren, Elise) (Modified on 4/4/2019 to remove link to #72) (slr).
April 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #74 Memorandum by American Medical Systems, Inc. in opposition. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
April 1, 2019 Filing 75 OPPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #72 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order to Enforce AMS's September 2018 Withdrawal of General Opinion Expert Eric Rovner, M.D. and to Strike Dr. Rovner's General Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McConnell, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM by American Medical Systems, Inc. in opposition to #73 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McConnell, Stephen) (Modified on 4/2/2019 to replace image) (ts).
March 19, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Waisbren, Elise)
March 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #72 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order to Enforce Prior Agreements Regarding Defense Case-Specific Expert Eric Rovner, M.D. and MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Strike Dr. Rovner's General Expert Report. (ts)
March 18, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order to Enforce Prior Agreements Regarding Defense Case-Specific Expert Eric Rovner, M.D. and MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Strike Dr. Rovner's General Expert Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Waisbren, Elise)
March 6, 2019 Filing 71 REPLY by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #69 Memorandum In Opposition to Motion to Preclude Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig from Offering Testimony on Plaintiff's Untimely Medical Examination (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Binis, Barbara) (Modified on 3/7/2019 to convert event to Reply to Response)(slr).
February 28, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT K TO PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC.S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DR. ROSENZWEIG FROM OFFERING TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFFS MEDICAL EXAMINATION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean re: #69 Memorandum In Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K (partially redacted))(Waisbren, Elise)
February 27, 2019 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean in opposition to #67 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Preclude Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig from Offering Testimony on Plaintiff's Untimely Medical Examination (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D (Redacted), #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G (Redacted), #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Waisbren, Elise)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #68 Memorandum of Law by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #67 Motion by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Preclude Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig from Offering Testimony on Plaintiff's Untimely Medical Examination. ERROR: Unredacted exhibits attached. CORRECTION: Unredacted exhibits removed and replaced with redacted exhibits. (ts)
February 14, 2019 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #67 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Preclude Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig from Offering Testimony on Plaintiff's Untimely Medical Examination (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Binis, Barbara) (Modified on 2/15/2019 to remove and replace unredacted exhibits) (ts).
February 14, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Preclude Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig from Offering Testimony on Plaintiff's Untimely Medical Examination (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Binis, Barbara)
December 28, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Elise A. Waisbren on behalf of Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean. (Waisbren, Elise)
November 27, 2018 Filing 65 OMNIBUS REPLY BRIEF by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #64 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4)(Weil, Rachel) (Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct link to and convert event to reply to response) (kp).
November 20, 2018 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean in opposition to #56 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Waisbren, Elise)
November 8, 2018 Filing 63 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #58 Notice of Video Deposition of James Elliott Coad, MD, FCAP (Binis, Barbara)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER The #55 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Strike 56 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703 is DENIED as to the striking of defendant's Motion to Limit Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. and GRANTED as to the request for an extension to respond to the motion; Plaintiffs Response to motion due 11/20/2018 and Defendant's Amended Reply due 11/27/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/8/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PRETRIAL ORDER # 268 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases December 5, 6 and 7, 2018) Directing that settlement conferences will be conducted as follows: 1. For the cases identified on Exhibit A, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 12/5/2018, at 9:00 a.m. 2. For the cases identified on Exhibit B, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 12/6/2018, at 9:00 a.m. 3. For the cases identified on Exhibit C, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 12/7/2018; further directing that (1) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel of record as reflected on the docket sheet for that plaintiff's case; and (2) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/8/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Identified on Exhibits A, B and C) (kab)
November 8, 2018 Filing 60 REPLY by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to #59 Response In Opposition. (Waisbren, Elise) (Modified on 11/9/2018 to remove link to #55 motion) (kp).
November 6, 2018 Filing 59 OPPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #55 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Strike #56 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703 (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Binis, Barbara)
November 6, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean of James Elliott Coad, M.D. on November 10, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Waisbren, Elise)
November 6, 2018 Filing 57 REPLY BRIEF by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #56 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-I) (originally filed in MDL 2325 at ECF No. 6877 on 11/01/2018) (mek)
November 6, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibits F-H, #3 Exhibits I-L, #4 Exhibits M-Q, #5 Exhibits R-U, #6 Exhibit V1, #7 Exhibit V2, #8 Exhibit V3, #9 Proposed Order)(originally docketed in MDL 2325 on 10/18/2018 at ECF #6722) (mms) (Modified on 1/24/2020 to remove attachment #1 and replace with redacted version pursuant to the #83 order) (kew).
November 6, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to Strike #56 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703 (Waisbren, Elise) (Modified on 11/7/2018 to add link to #56 motion) (kp).
November 1, 2018 Filing 54 REPLY by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to #52 Memorandum In Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H)(Waisbren, Elise) (Modified on 11/2/2018 to remove links to #48 motion and #49 memorandum of law) (mk).
November 1, 2018 Filing 53 REPLY by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #50 Response In Opposition (McConnell, Stephen)
October 25, 2018 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in opposition to #48 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Partial Summary Judgment on Causation for Count I - Negligence (Failure to Warn) and Count IV - Failure to Warn (Strict Liability). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibits A-E)(Binis, Barbara)
October 25, 2018 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean in support of response in opposition to #46 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment. (Waisbren, Elise)
October 25, 2018 Filing 50 RESPONSE by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean in opposition to #46 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Waisbren, Elise) (Modified on 10/29/2018 to remove link to #47 memorandum) (mkw).
October 18, 2018 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ricky Mclean and Samantha Mclean in support of #48 MOTION by Ricky Mclean and Samantha Mclean for Partial Summary Judgment on Causation For Count I - Negligence (Failure to Warn) and Count IV - Failure to Warn (Strict Liability)(Waisbren, Elise)
October 18, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION by Ricky Mclean and Samantha Mclean for Partial Summary Judgment on Causation for Count I - Negligence (Failure to Warn) and Count IV - Failure to Warn (Strict Liability) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Waisbren, Elise) (Modified document title on 10/19/2018) (slr).
October 18, 2018 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #46 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (Binis, Barbara)
October 18, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Proposed Order)(Binis, Barbara)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PRETRIAL ORDER # 265 (Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases) It is ORDERED that: 1.) Counsel for plaintiffs in the cases identified on the attached Exhibit A, who have alleged claims against American Medical Systems, Inc. or Astora Womens Health, LLC are directed to meet and confer with Reisman Karron Greene LLP, settlement counsel for AMS, on or before 11/2/2018, and to engage in good faith discussions about the possibility of settlement. 2.) As to the cases identified on Exhibit B, those cases, to the extent they are on the inactive docket, are returned to the active docket and the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove the inactive flag. Counsel for plaintiffs in the cases identified on Exhibit B, who have alleged claims against American Medical Systems, Inc. or Astora Womens Health, LLC are directed to meet and confer with Reisman Karron Greene LLP, settlement counsel for AMS, on or before 11/2/2018, and to engage in good faith discussions about the possibility of settlement. 3.) Messrs. Aylstock, Garrard, Potts and Thompson and AMS Settlement Counsel are directed to provide a joint written report to the court via email on 11/6/2018, identifying which cases remaining on Exhibits A and B, if any, have not been resolved or dismissed. 4.) On 11/8/2018, the court will enter an order identifying the cases where a settlement conference will be conducted because the case was not resolved or dismissed. That order will identify on which of the following dates the parties in each case must appear for the settlement conference: 12/5/2018, 12/6/2018 or 12/7/2018 or such other date as set by the Court. Each day, the settlement conferences will begin at 9:00 a.m. in Charleston, West Virginia at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse Settlement conferences will continue in each case from day-today and parties should come prepared for evening work. 5.) Individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference along with counsel of record. 6.) Any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. 7.) Cases not settled during the settlement conference will be dealt with by further order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/17/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibits A-B) (klc)
October 16, 2018 Filing 44 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES to #43 Notice of Video Deposition of Eric Rovner, M.D. by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Binis, Barbara)
October 8, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean of Eric Rovner, M.D. on October 17, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Waisbren, Elise)
October 4, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Second Amended Designation and Disclosure of Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Waisbren, Elise)
September 29, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for First Amended Rule 26 Case Specific Expert Report. (Waisbren, Elise)
September 25, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on October 1, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara)
September 25, 2018 Filing 39 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean of Samuel Grampsas, M.D. on September 27, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Waisbren, Elise)
September 14, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Samuel Grampsas, MD on September 27, 2018 at 1:00 PM (Binis, Barbara)
August 29, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean of Gregory Link, D.O. on September 28, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Waisbren, Elise)
July 12, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Amended Designation and Disclosure of Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Waisbren, Elise)
June 27, 2018 Filing 35 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean of Jason Lowe, M.D. on July 13, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Waisbren, Elise)
June 26, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF AMENDED DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Jason Lowe, M.D. on July 13, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara)
June 19, 2018 Filing 33 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Samuel Grampsas, M.D. (Binis, Barbara)
June 15, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Responses to Defendant's Requests for Admissions. (Waisbren, Elise)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRETRIAL ORDER # 255 (Amended Docket Control Order American Medical Systems Inc. Wave 3 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 249. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 3 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; AMS Wave 3 Cases) (pma)
June 11, 2018 Filing 30 CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean of AHMED EL-ZAWAHRY, M.D. on June 15, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Waisbren, Elise)
June 4, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Designation and Disclosure of Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Waisbren, Elise)
May 31, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Samuel Grampsas, M.D. by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Binis, Barbara)
May 22, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Jason Lowe, M.D. on June 22, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL ORDER #253 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases) Directing that the settlement conferences will be conducted as follows: 1. For the cases identified on Exhibit A, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 6/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in room 5600B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. 2. For the cases identified on Exhibit B, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 6/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in room 5600B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. 3. For the cases identified on Exhibit C, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 6/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in room 5600B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. Further directing that (1) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel of record as reflected on the docket sheet for that plaintiff's case; and (2) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. If the parties reach a settlement in a case listed on Exhibits A, B or C, submission of an inactive docket order for that case will relieve plaintiff and her counsel from the obligation of attending the mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2018. (cc: Clrek of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibits A, B & C) (st)
May 14, 2018 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on 05/08/2018, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Kimberly Kaufman, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 5/24/2018. Redaction Request due 6/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2018. (klk)
May 10, 2018 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Ahmed El-Zawahry, M.D. on June 15, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER The court GRANTS, in part, and DENIES, in part the #14 MOTION for Protective Order, as more fully set forth herein; directing the parties to work together on obtaining dates for physician depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/8/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek)
May 8, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/8/2018 re: #14 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order Court Reporter: Kimberly Kaufman. (hkl)
May 8, 2018 Filing 21 TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/8/2018: Court Reporter: Kimberly Kaufman. (tmr)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing that a telephonic hearing on the #14 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order shall take place on Tuesday, 5/8/2018 at 11:00 a.m. EDT, before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge. The number required to connect to the telephonic hearing has previously been provided to counsel by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 5/7/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek)
May 3, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean to #18 Memorandum In Opposition. (Waisbren, Elise) (Modified on 5/4/2018 to remove link to #14 motion and #15 exhibits) (kp).
May 3, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in opposition to #14 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Weil, Rachel)
May 3, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Withdraw #16 Notice of Deposition (Binis, Barbara)
May 3, 2018 Filing 16 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE #86 ORDER ENTERED ON 2/25/2020: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Jason Lowe, M.D. on May 18, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara) (Modified on 2/26/2020 to note notice has been stricken) (kew).
May 1, 2018 Filing 15 EXHIBITS B and C by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean in support of #14 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Waisbren, Elise)
April 30, 2018 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #14 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order. (ts)
April 30, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean for Protective Order (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Waisbren, Elise)
April 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Ahmed El-Zawahry, M.D. on May 24, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (Binis, Barbara)
March 19, 2018 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Waisbren, Elise)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 251 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases) It is ORDERED that: 1. Counsel for plaintiffs, identified on the attached Exhibit A, who have alleged claims against American Medical Systems, Inc. or Astora Women's Health, LLC and whose cases have not been resolved and are not subject to an agreement in principle to resolve, are directed to meet and confer with Reisman Karron Greene LLP, settlement counsel for AMS, on or before 5/14/2018 and to engage in good faith discussions about the possibility of settlement. Counsel may also contact Bryan Aylstock, Henry Garrard, or Fred Thompson, coordinating co-lead counsel for plaintiffs, regarding coordination of settlement discussions with AMS. 2. Counsel Reisman, Aylstock, Garrard, and Thompson are directed to provide a joint written report to the court via email on 5/18/2018 identifying which cases remaining on Exhibit A, if any, have not been resolved or dismissed. 3. In all cases that have not been resolved or dismissed by 5/18/2018, the court will conduct settlement conferences in Charleston, West Virginia at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, Room 7009 beginning at 9:00 a.m. on 6/4/2018, and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. Parties should come prepared for evening work. 4. The court will enter an order on 5/22/2018 identifying the cases wherein a settlement conference will be conducted. 5. Individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel. 6. Any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. 7. Cases not settled during the settlement conference will be dealt with by further order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/19/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (rec)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 249 (Docket Control Order - American Medical Systems Inc. Wave 3 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 3 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any case(s) in the American Medical Systems, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 case is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 case is incorporated in the American Medical Systems, Inc., Wave 3 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 3 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 3 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; AMS Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (pma)
June 20, 2017 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Waisbren, Elise)
April 23, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael)
April 23, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik)
February 25, 2014 Filing 6 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 121 (Order Cancelling March 13, 2014, Status Conference) entered on 02/24/2014 in MDL 2325 to attorneys in member case. (cbo)
February 24, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Terrence M. Quinn on behalf of Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean. (Quinn, Terrence)
February 24, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Stephen D. Phillips on behalf of Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean. (Phillips, Stephen)
February 24, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Elise A. Waisbren on behalf of Ricky Mclean, Samantha Mclean. (Waisbren, Elise)
February 21, 2014 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Medical Systems, Inc. re: #1 Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (ts)
February 21, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3031283. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mclean et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Represented By: Barbara R Binis
Represented By: Stephen J. McConnell
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Christopher R Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha McLean
Represented By: Terrence M. Quinn
Represented By: Elise A. Waisbren
Represented By: Stephen D. Phillips
Represented By: Stephen D Phillips
Represented By: Elise A Waisbren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Mclean
Represented By: Terrence M. Quinn
Represented By: Elise A. Waisbren
Represented By: Stephen D. Phillips
Represented By: Stephen D Phillips
Represented By: Elise A Waisbren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?