Taylor v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Kennado K Taylor
Defendant: . Cook, Colin Stirling Bruce, . Howell, D Lewis, Jessica Sullivan, . Petro, Karl Webber, . Miller, . Frazer, . Ramzi, . Brown, . Molinero, . Reed, Krastle Carlson, . Jackson, . Foster, . Yuhaus, . Caskell, Sara Darrow and Leonta Jackson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01141
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Michael M Mihm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Compliance re Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines:,,, #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Donnell, Andrew)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION filed by Kennado K Taylor. (RK, ilcd)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 4/17/2020. On 4/7/20, the Court reviewed Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order in which he alleged that officers at Pontiac were threatening to kill him. The Court requested that the Pontiac Warden Leonta Jackson, or his designee, file a response within seven days. The Court noted that Plaintiff professes to be mentally ill and instructed the that, if Plaintiff's allegations are believed to be to delusional and related to his mental illness, that the Warden provide a report from a mental health professional attesting to this. Warden Jackson now files #9 , indicating that he has undertaken a preliminary investigation of the matter. He has spoken to the identified officers who deny Plaintiff's allegations. He has also spoken with Doctor Renzi, a mental health provider who has personal knowledge of Plaintiff and who will provide an affidavit. Warden Jackson requests an extension through April 21, 2020, so as to obtain affidavits from Doctor Renzi and the identified officers. #9 is GRANTED.(SAG, ilcd)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 4/17/2020. Plaintiff files #7 , captioned a Motion to the Court. There, he advises the Court that, though he has a mental illness, he is currently being held in the Pontiac BMU Behavioral unit and not the CMU mental health unit. This appears to be response to the Court's query as to whether Plaintiff's allegations are related to his mental health issues. #7 is GRANTED to the extent that the Court makes note of Plaintiff's current placement. Plaintiff also files a declaration #10 , reiterating that he is at risk of harm, asking to be moved out of Pontiac. To the extent that #10 requests relief of this Court, it is DENIED, pending Warden Jackson's response. (SAG, ilcd)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines:,,, #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant. Jackson. Responses due by 4/28/2020 (O'Donnell, Andrew)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew J O'Donnell on behalf of. Jackson (O'Donnell, Andrew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to the Court by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 4/27/2020 (RK, ilcd)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 4/7/2020. Plaintiff is a 3-striker who files #6 , a motion for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order. Plaintiff alleges that he is being held in the Pontiac South mental health unit and that six correctional officers have threatened to kill him and to pay other inmates to kill him. While the allegations might well be delusions related to Plaintiff's underlying mental illness, the allegations are serious. Accordingly, officials at Pontiac are to undertake an investigation and file a response identified as a Notice of Compliance within 7 days. If officials believe that the claims are unfounded and delusional, they are to provide a report from a mental health professional attesting to this. A copy of this order is to be sent to the Pontiac Warden, Leonta Jackson or his designee.(SAG, ilcd)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 4/20/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kennado K Taylor. Responses due by 4/20/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Kennado K Taylor (SAG, ilcd)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Kennado K Taylor.(SAG, ilcd)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kennado K Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Stirling Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Petro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Ramzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Molinero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krastle Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Yuhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Caskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonta Jackson
Represented By: Andrew J O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennado K Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?